WYANT v. SAUL
Plaintiff: HARVEY R. WYANT, III
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv05183
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Referring Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Standing Procedural Order for Cases Seeking Social Security Review 12/9/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (jaa, )
December 6, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 2 U.S. MARSHALS AND 1 U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL on 12/9/19 (jaa, )
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES; THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(I) AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 12/6/19.12/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TO HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/15/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by HARVEY R. WYANT, III.. (IMBESI, STEPHANIE)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(amas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by HARVEY R. WYANT, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by HARVEY R. WYANT, III.(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WYANT v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARVEY R. WYANT, III
Represented By: STEPHANIE M. IMBESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?