ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY and ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv05188
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 2/28/2020. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 3/30/2020. A TELECONFERENCE TO DISCUSS SETTLEMENT SHALL TAKE PLACE ON 4/20/2020, AT 3:00 PM. MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 4/27/2020. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA NO LATER THAN 5/4/2020. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 5/6/2020, AT 10:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 14B. THIS MATTER IS IN THE 5/11/2020 TRIAL POOL. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/10/2019. 12/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Pretrial Conference held on 12/10/2019 (amas)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (amas)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE 12/9/2019 RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 12/10/2019, AT 12:30 PM. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/3/2019. 12/3/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/9/2019, AT 2:00 PM, IN COURTROOM 14B, ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/22/2019. 11/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(HEINOLD, KEITH)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH D. HEINOLD on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY with Certificate of Service(HEINOLD, KEITH)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(bw, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 004553. (Filing fee $ 411 receipt number PPE206259)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH L. MCGLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH L. MCGLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL SALVATI
Represented By: KEITH D. HEINOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?