ARIAS et al v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Plaintiff: YSMAEL ARIAS and ALTAGRACIA TEJADA
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv05227
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A FED.R.CIV.P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 1/14/20 AT 2:30 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/2/19. 12/5/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE CURRENT ARBITRATION HEARING DATE, SET FOR 3/12/20 IS HEREBY VACATED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/3/19. 12/3/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, COPY TO ARB CLERK.(jl, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (NAYEEM, SARAH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by YSMAEL ARIAS, ALTAGRACIA TEJADA. Amendment to #7 Notice of Appearance . (NAYEEM, SARAH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH R. NAYEEM on behalf of YSMAEL ARIAS, ALTAGRACIA TEJADA. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE PAPER #8 FOR CORRECT FILING). (NAYEEM, SARAH) Modified on 12/2/2019 (fb).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER, SCHEDULED FOR 12/3/19 IS CANCELLED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/25/19. 11/25/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 3/12/2020 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(kp, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT A FED.R.CIV. P.16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 12/3/19 AT 3:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/12/19. 11/12/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP.(PRATT, SHARLENN)
November 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (sg, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP.(sg, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 191000135. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 206415) (Attachments: #1 TRACK FORM, #2 DESIGNATION FORM)(sg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARIAS et al v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YSMAEL ARIAS
Represented By: BRANDON A. SWARTZ
Represented By: SARAH R. NAYEEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTAGRACIA TEJADA
Represented By: BRANDON A. SWARTZ
Represented By: SARAH R. NAYEEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Represented By: SHARLENN E. PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?