WILLIAMS v. ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LLOYD WILLIAMS
Defendant: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC, ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC. and MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05252
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by IRA NEIL RICHARDS on behalf of LLOYD WILLIAMS with Certificate of Service(RICHARDS, IRA)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE A. SHORT on behalf of LLOYD WILLIAMS with Certificate of Service(SHORT, STEPHANIE)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/15/2020 AT 10:00 AM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 1/2/20. 1/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Encore Capital Group, Inc. with Certificate of Service by MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC.(BURNETTE, LAUREN)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Encore Capital Group, Inc. with Certificate of Service by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC..(BURNETTE, LAUREN)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC..(BURNETTE, LAUREN)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC., MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC.(BURNETTE, LAUREN)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO 12/23/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/10/19. 12/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Milton Uricoechea re: served summons and complaint upon Midland Funding, LLC by personal service on registered agent on 11/18/2019 (FOGDALL, STEPHEN)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Milton Uricoechea re: served summons and complaint upon Midland Credit Management, Inc. by personal service on registered agent on 11/18/2019 (FOGDALL, STEPHEN)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Milton Uricoechea re: served summons and complaint upon Encore Capital Group, Inc. by personal service on registered agent on 11/18/2019 (FOGDALL, STEPHEN)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC., MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206505.), filed by LLOYD WILLIAMS.(bw, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LLOYD WILLIAMS. (bw, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 3 Summons Issued as to ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC., MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/8/19 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: LAUREN M. BURNETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC.
Represented By: LAUREN M. BURNETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: LAUREN M. BURNETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LLOYD WILLIAMS
Represented By: STEPHEN ANDREW FOGDALL
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. SHORT
Represented By: IRA NEIL RICHARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?