RUBIN v. MANGAN et al
Plaintiff: RENE ROTHSTEIN RUBIN
Defendant: MANGAN & GINSBERG LLP, MICHAEL ROTHSTEIN, STIFEL NICOLAUS & COMPANY., INC. and MICHAEL P. MANGAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv05301
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MICHAEL P. MANGAN, MANGAN & GINSBERG LLP.Memorandum, Affidavit, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Affidavit Exhibit A, #4 Affidavit Exhibit B, #5 Declaration, #6 Certificate of Service)(DOUGHERTY, CANDIDUS)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by CANDIDUS K. DOUGHERTY on behalf of MICHAEL P. MANGAN, MANGAN & GINSBERG LLP (DOUGHERTY, CANDIDUS)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JOHN SAVAGE re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon MICHAEL ROTHSTEIN by PERSONAL SERVICE on 1/1/20 (rf, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY B. MCCARRON on behalf of MICHAEL P. MANGAN, MANGAN & GINSBERG LLP with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(MCCARRON, JEFFREY)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RENE ROTHSTEIN RUBIN As To Defendant Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Inc.(WEINSTEIN, HILLARY)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Michael P. Mangan, Esquire and Mangan & Ginsberg, LLP by Certified Mail on November 18, 2019 (WEINSTEIN, HILLARY)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JEROME M. MARCUS on behalf of RENE ROTHSTEIN RUBIN with Certificate of Service(MARCUS, JEROME)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID S. SENOFF on behalf of RENE ROTHSTEIN RUBIN with Certificate of Service(SENOFF, DAVID)
November 11, 2019 4 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL P. MANGAN, MANGAN & GINSBERG LLP, MICHAEL ROTHSTEIN, STIFEL NICOLAUS & COMPANY., INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/12/2019 (amas)
November 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RENE ROTHSTEIN RUBIN. (amas)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL P. MANGAN, MANGAN & GINSBERG LLP, MICHAEL ROTHSTEIN, STIFEL NICOLAUS & COMPANY., INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 206648.), filed by RENE ROTHSTEIN RUBIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-F, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUBIN v. MANGAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANGAN & GINSBERG LLP
Represented By: CANDIDUS K. DOUGHERTY
Represented By: JEFFREY B. MCCARRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL ROTHSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STIFEL NICOLAUS & COMPANY., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL P. MANGAN
Represented By: CANDIDUS K. DOUGHERTY
Represented By: JEFFREY B. MCCARRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENE ROTHSTEIN RUBIN
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Represented By: DAVID S. SENOFF
Represented By: JEROME M. MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?