BYRD v. PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS
Plaintiff: IDRISS K. BYRD
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS
Case Number: 2:2019cv05305
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Referring Judge: ROBERT F KELLY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY TO HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/26/2019. 11/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH L. GORDON on behalf of PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GORDON, JOSEPH)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GAETAN ALFANO on behalf of PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ALFANO, GAETAN)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by IDRISS K. BYRD. PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS waiver sent on 11/13/2019, answer due 1/12/2020. (GUNTER, KARIN)
November 12, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/12/2019 (bw, )
November 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by IDRISS K. BYRD. (bw, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206646.), filed by IDRISS K. BYRD.(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BYRD v. PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS
Represented By: JOSEPH L. GORDON
Represented By: GAETAN ALFANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDRISS K. BYRD
Represented By: KARIN M. GUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?