SEFAC USA, INC. v. GRAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: SEFAC USA, INC.
Defendant: GRAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05375
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Stay or Transfer re #8 MOTION to Dismiss , Stay or Transfer filed by SEFAC USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alvin C. Lin, #2 Exhibit A - First Action -Gray v SEFAC Complaint with Exhibits, #3 Exhibit B - Second Action - Gray v SEFAC, S.A. Complaint with Exhibits, #4 Exhibit C - ECF 75 excerpt (MTC), #5 Exhibit D - Motion for Leave to file Suppl Reply, #6 Exhibit E - USPTO Application, #7 Exhibit F - Virginia Action-Complaint w Exhs, #8 Exhibit G - Press-Release-SEFAC-SW3, #9 Exhibit H - Third Action - Complaint, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(LIN, ALVIN)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss , Stay or Transfer filed by GRAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC..Brief, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(ROGERS, EMILY)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed by Ali Howat re: served Complaint, Summons upon Sally Sanders, Director of HR on 12/09/19, answer due 12/30/2019. (BROWN, MARY) Modified on 12/23/2019 (tjd).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ALVIN C. LIN TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE (ECF NO. #4 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/18/2019.12/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF BARRY G. MAGIDOFF TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE (ECF NO #3 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/18/2019.12/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(nd, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Alvin C. Lin ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13990752.) filed by SEFAC USA, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BROWN, MARY)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Barry G. Magidoff ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13990750.) filed by SEFAC USA, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BROWN, MARY)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including SEFAC S.A. by SEFAC USA, INC..(BROWN, MARY)
November 14, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to GRAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.. Given To: COUNSEL on 11/15/2019 (bw, )
November 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SEFAC USA, INC.. (bw, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GRAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206891.), filed by SEFAC USA, INC..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEFAC USA, INC. v. GRAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEFAC USA, INC.
Represented By: MARY KAY BROWN
Represented By: ALVIN C. LIN
Represented By: BARRY G. MAGIDOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: EMILY J. ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?