FRANK et al v. ACME MARKETS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JULIE FRANK and SCOTT ROYER
Defendant: ACME MARKETS, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL, CMI HOLDING CORPORATION, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. and GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05383
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Original record transferred to District of New Jersey via Interdistrict transfer system. (MDL 2738, cto-184). (tjd)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Cancellation of HearingPRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR THURSDAY 1/9/20 AT 3:30 PM BEFORE JUDGE BAYLSON IS CANCELED.(lds, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order that Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (jaa, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing:PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/9/2020 03:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(lds, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(MILLER, CHANDA)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J. MCCORMICK, JR on behalf of JULIE FRANK, SCOTT ROYER with Certificate of Service(MCCORMICK, BRIAN)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON & JOHNSON for JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., Certificate of Service by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(mbh, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, Certificate of Service(mbh, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal by JOHNSON & JOHNSON and JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. from Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, Case Number Nov 2019 No. 000109, Certificate of Service (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206923)(mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #1 Exhibits) (mbh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRANK et al v. ACME MARKETS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACME MARKETS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMI HOLDING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE FRANK
Represented By: BRIAN J. MCCORMICK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT ROYER
Represented By: BRIAN J. MCCORMICK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?