TSOULI-MOUFID v. CREDIT CONTROL, LLC
Plaintiff: JAAFAR TSOULI-MOUFID
Defendant: CREDIT CONTROL, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05400
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 4/15/2020 at 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5-C.(ahf)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/26/2019. 12/2/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Credit Control Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by CREDIT CONTROL, LLC.(MILLER, SHANNON)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CREDIT CONTROL, LLC.(MILLER, SHANNON)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CREDIT CONTROL, LLC from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS CHESTER COUNTY, case number 2019-10384-MJ. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206947), EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TSOULI-MOUFID v. CREDIT CONTROL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAAFAR TSOULI-MOUFID
Represented By: FREDERICK EDWARD DAVIS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREDIT CONTROL, LLC
Represented By: SHANNON P. MILLER
Represented By: THOMAS R. DOMINCZYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?