TEJADA v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: KELVIN TEJADA
Defendant: CORRIZON HEALTH, INC., CORIZON EMPLOYEE JOHN DOE, DR. LEE BERMAN, MHM EMPLOYEE JOHN DOE, DR. ROBERT HARMAN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MHM SERVICES, INC., CORRECTIONS OFFICERS JOHN DOE, DEXTINA SMITH, DR. MARK PIMSLEUR, KRISTI PAPIRO and SUSAN ACKIEQICZ
Cross Defendant: CORIZON HEALTH INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05448
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT by KELVIN TEJADA. (ZEIGER, BRIAN)
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW K. HUBBARD on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(HUBBARD, MATTHEW)
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by SUSAN ACKIEQICZ, LEE BERMAN, ROBERT HARMAN, MHM SERVICES, INC., KRISTI PAPIRO, MARK PIMSLEUR of Intention to Enter Judgment of Non Pros (NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUSAN ACKIEQICZ. SUSAN ACKIEQICZ waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by CASSIDY L. NEAL on behalf of SUSAN ACKIEQICZ with Certificate of Service(NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against CORIZON HEALTH INC. by MHM SERVICES, INC..(NEAL, CASSIDY) Modified on 1/14/2020 (lvj, ).
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against MHM SERVICES, INC. by CORRIZON HEALTH, INC..(GREGORY, THOMAS)
December 30, 2019 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CORRIZON HEALTH, INC.. (SEE #11 FOR ATTACHMENT)(lvj, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by CORRIZON HEALTH, INC. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (GREGORY, THOMAS)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CORRIZON HEALTH, INC.. (GREGORY, THOMAS)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA A. CAULEY on behalf of CORRIZON HEALTH, INC. with Certificate of Service(CAULEY, LISA)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. GREGORY on behalf of CORRIZON HEALTH, INC. with Certificate of Service(GREGORY, THOMAS)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARK PIMSLEUR. MARK PIMSLEUR waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KRISTI PAPIRO. KRISTI PAPIRO waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT HARMAN. ROBERT HARMAN waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LEE BERMAN. LEE BERMAN waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MHM SERVICES, INC.. MHM SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CASSIDY L. NEAL on behalf of LEE BERMAN, ROBERT HARMAN, MHM SERVICES, INC., KRISTI PAPIRO, MARK PIMSLEUR with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(NEAL, CASSIDY)
November 20, 2019 9 Summons Issued as to SUSAN ACKIEQICZ, LEE BERMAN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, CORRIZON HEALTH, INC., ROBERT HARMAN, MHM SERVICES, INC., KRISTI PAPIRO, MARK PIMSLEUR, DEXTINA SMITH. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/20/2019 (bw, )
November 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KELVIN TEJADA. (bw, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUSAN ACKIEQICZ, LEE BERMAN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, CORIZON EMPLOYEE JOHN DOE, CORRECTIONS OFFICERS JOHN DOE, CORRIZON HEALTH, INC., ROBERT HARMAN, MHM EMPLOYEE JOHN DOE, MHM SERVICES, INC., KRISTI PAPIRO, MARK PIMSLEUR, DEXTINA SMITH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207130.), filed by KELVIN TEJADA.(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEJADA v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELVIN TEJADA
Represented By: BRIAN J. ZEIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRIZON HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS J. GREGORY
Represented By: LISA A. CAULEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON EMPLOYEE JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LEE BERMAN
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM EMPLOYEE JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. ROBERT HARMAN
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: MATTHEW K. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICERS JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEXTINA SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MARK PIMSLEUR
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTI PAPIRO
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN ACKIEQICZ
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CORIZON HEALTH INC
Represented By: THOMAS J. GREGORY
Represented By: LISA A. CAULEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?