THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION et al v. WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, TINA CATANZARO and ANTHONY CATANZARO
Defendant: WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION and HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05514
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. JUDGE CARACAPPA WILL CONTACT COUNSEL TO INITIATE THE SETTLEMENT PROCESS & SHALL HOLD THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BY NO LATER THAN 3/16/2020. ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT & TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/14/2020. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT & DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 12/23/2020, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/7/20. 1/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG RULE 16 TELEPHONE Conference held on 1/7/20. (jl, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KYLE W. LECLERE, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/6/20. 1/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (W/ECF APPLICATION) AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Main Document 18 replaced on 1/7/2020) (mbh, ).
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 Report Of RULE 26(f) MEETING by ANTHONY CATANZARO, TINA CATANZARO. (HARRINGTON, ROGER)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (nd, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Kyle W. LeClere, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14004670.) filed by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION.Affidavits and Certificate of Service.(GAREMORE, JOSEPH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint of Anthony and Tina Catanzaro by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..(GAREMORE, JOSEPH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint of Anthony and Tina Catanzaro by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION.(GAREMORE, JOSEPH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 190704227 AND 190801097. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, EXHIBIT.(sg, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANTHONY CATANZARO, TINA CATANZARO. (HARRINGTON, ROGER)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(GAREMORE, JOSEPH) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE IN HARD COPY* Modified on 12/18/2019 (lisad, ).
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF SERVICE by ANTHONY CATANZARO, TINA CATANZARO (HARRINGTON, ROGER) Modified on 12/5/2019 (lisad, ).
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF SERVICE by ANTHONY CATANZARO, TINA CATANZARO (HARRINGTON, ROGER) Modified on 12/5/2019 (lisad, ).
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/7/2020 AT 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. (sl, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..(GAREMORE, JOSEPH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION.(GAREMORE, JOSEPH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
November 25, 2019 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including THE HOME DEPOT, INC. by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. *FOR PDF SEE DOC. #3 * (lisad, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Home Depot USA Inc. by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (GAREMORE, JOSEPH)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent VANGUARD GROUP, INC., Corporate Parent PRIMECAP MANAGEMENT COMPANY for WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION.(bw, ) Modified on 11/25/2019 (lisad, ).
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 190704227. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207236)(bw, ) Modified on 11/25/2019 (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION et al v. WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: KIM AUERBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA CATANZARO
Represented By: KIM AUERBACH
Represented By: ROGER J. HARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY CATANZARO
Represented By: KIM AUERBACH
Represented By: ROGER J. HARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH M. GAREMORE
Represented By: KYLE W. LECLERE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH M. GAREMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?