SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD. v. SLYCE ACQUISITION INC.
Plaintiff: SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD.
Defendant: SLYCE ACQUISITION INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05516
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew K. Gates ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14032561.) filed by SLYCE ACQUISITION INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, MELANIE)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael Chibib ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14032520.) filed by SLYCE ACQUISITION INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, MELANIE)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A FRCP 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 3/24/20 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/8/20. 1/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MELANIE A. MILLER on behalf of SLYCE ACQUISITION INC. with Certificate of Service(MILLER, MELANIE)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF GUY YONAY, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/24/19.12/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTY.(kw, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Guy Yonay, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14006769.) filed by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD..Certificate of Service.(DURANT, MARC)
December 22, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibits by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD. re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Fto Complaint, #7 Exhibit G to Complaint)(DURANT, MARC) Modified on 12/23/2019 (fb).
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD.. All Defendants. (DURANT, MARC)
November 22, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to SLYCE ACQUISITION INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/25/2019 (bw, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD..(bw, )
November 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD.. (bw, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SLYCE ACQUISITION INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207246.), filed by SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD. v. SLYCE ACQUISITION INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLYCE ACQUISITION INC.
Represented By: MELANIE A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYTE-VISUAL CONCEPTION LTD.
Represented By: MARC DURANT
Represented By: GUY YONAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?