THE ESTATE OF ISAAC DEJESUS et al v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RAQUEL GARCIA and THE ESTATE OF ISAAC DEJESUS
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, ANDREA BRANNEN, MCKENZIE NASH, LIA PIAZZA, MICHELLE HENRY, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC. and DR ERIN BROWN
Case Number: 2:2019cv05584
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (GOODRICH, CAITLIN)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIN BROWN. ERIN BROWN waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by CASSIDY L. NEAL on behalf of ERIN BROWN with Certificate of Service(NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY B. RYAN-FIORE on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC with Certificate of Service(RYAN-FIORE, EMILY)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH D. POWELL, JR on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC with Certificate of Service(POWELL, KENNETH)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLIN J. GOODRICH on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC with Certificate of Service(GOODRICH, CAITLIN)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHELLE HENRY. MICHELLE HENRY waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.. MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CASSIDY L. NEAL on behalf of MICHELLE HENRY, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(NEAL, CASSIDY)
November 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RAQUEL GARCIA, THE ESTATE OF ISAAC DEJESUS. (jl, )
November 27, 2019 7 Summons Issued as to ANDREA BRANNEN, ERIN BROWN, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, MICHELLE HENRY, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., MCKENZIE NASH, LIA PIAZZA. Forwarded To: WILLIAM DAVIS on 11/27/19 (jl, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREA BRANNEN, ERIN BROWN, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, MICHELLE HENRY, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., MCKENZIE NASH, LIA PIAZZA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207841.), filed by RAQUEL GARCIA, THE ESTATE OF ISAAC DEJESUS, JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE ESTATE OF ISAAC DEJESUS et al v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: EMILY B. RYAN-FIORE
Represented By: CAITLIN J. GOODRICH
Represented By: KENNETH D. POWELL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA BRANNEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKENZIE NASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIA PIAZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE HENRY
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR ERIN BROWN
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAQUEL GARCIA
Represented By: WILLIAM M. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF ISAAC DEJESUS
Represented By: WILLIAM M. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?