TIRABASSO v. CAPITAL COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DIANE P. TIRABASSO
Defendant: CAPITAL COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. and DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE
Case Number: 2:2019cv05704
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Default by DIANE P. TIRABASSO against CAPITAL COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.. (RAYZ, ARKADY)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 Letter re: Request for Default by DIANE P. TIRABASSO against CAPITAL COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.. (RAYZ, ARKADY) Modified on 1/23/2020 (nd, ).
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Letter re: Request for Default by DIANE P. TIRABASSO against CAPITAL COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.. (RAYZ, ARKADY) Modified on 1/23/2020 (nd, ).
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Arkady "Eric" Rayz re: served Complaint and Summons upon Defendant by Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested on 12/11/2019 (RAYZ, ARKADY)
December 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DIANE P. TIRABASSO. (jaa, )
December 4, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to CAPITAL COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/4/19 (jaa, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL COLLECTION SERVICE, INC., DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207735.) filed by DIANE P. TIRABASSO.(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIRABASSO v. CAPITAL COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE P. TIRABASSO
Represented By: ARKADY ERIC RAYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?