WILSON v. DELBALSO et al
Petitioner: LEROY A. WILSON
Respondent: TERESA DELBALSO, PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION & PAROLE, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF JOSH SHAPIRO, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY and KEVIN R. STEEL
Case Number: 2:2019cv05723
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Referring Judge: DAVID R STRAWBRIDGE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS GRANTED AND THAT THE DEADLINE FOR THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION IS EXTENDED TO 3/24/20. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 1/24/20.1/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by TERESA DELBALSO, PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION & PAROLE, KEVIN R. STEEL, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF JOSH SHAPIRO, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE.(FALIN, ROBERT)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 Letter dated 12/22/19 by LEROY A. WILSON to Clerk, re: Request to Withdraw/Amend Writ of Habeas Corpus From 2254 to 2241. (va, )
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT BOTH THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY AND THE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL SHAL LFILE ON OR BEFORE 1/25/2020 A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION PURSUANT TO RULE 5 FOL. 28 U.S.C. SEC. 2254, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/9/19. 12/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(kw, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. FALIN on behalf of TERESA DELBALSO, PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION & PAROLE, KEVIN R. STEEL, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF JOSH SHAPIRO, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY with Certificate of Service(FALIN, ROBERT)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FROM CASE 19-CV-5205 by LEROY A. WILSON. (jaa, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COPY OF ORDER RE: ORDERED THAT THE COURT CONSTRUES THE PETITION AS A CHALLENGE TO HIS BERKS COUNTY CONVICTION WHICH IS SET FORTH AS GROUND 1 IN THE PETITION; THE CLAIM SET FORTH AS GROUND 2 IN THE PETITION, CHALLENGING HIS MONTGOMERY COUNTY CONVICTION IS SEVERED FROM THE PRESENT PETITION; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL OPEN A SEPARATE AND NEW SECTION 2254 PETITION FOR THE CHALLENGE TO THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY CONVICTION LISTED ABOVE, AND SHALL FILE A DUPLICATE OF THE PETITION ON THE NEWLY OPENED DOCKET; BOTH CASES ARE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF BERKS COUNTY WIT A COPY OF THE PETITION AND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION AND A COPY OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/5/19. 12/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PETITIONER.(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. DELBALSO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TERESA DELBALSO
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION & PAROLE
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF JOSH SHAPIRO
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN R. STEEL
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEROY A. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?