COOMES v. ECKERT SEAMANS CHERIN & MELLOT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH COOMES
Defendant: PARK PALAIS LLC, ANN CLARY GORDON, ESQ., SHAPIRO SHER, ECKERT SEAMANS CHERIN & MELLOTT, LLC, LAWRENCE JEFFREY GROSS, SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER, P.A., MARK L. MILLER, RDQ., VIRGINIA STATE CORPORATION COMMISSION, AMBASSADOR LUIS GUINOT, JR., SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL II LLC, ESQ. DOUGLAS PALAIS, MARYLAND INSURANCE ADMINISTRATION, VIRGINIA BUREAU OF INSURANCE, RAYMOND ANDERSON, SILVERMAN THOMPSON SLUTKIN & WHITE LLC, ERIC R. HARLAN, ESQ., ALEX J. BROWN, ESQ., DANIEL J. ZELLER, ESQ., NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS, WILLIAM E. CARLSON, ESQ., J. PATRICK GILL, ESQ., RENEE S. LANE KUNZ, ESQ., PAUL MARK SANDLER, ESQ., STATE OF MARYLAND, ESQ. IOANNIS LASKARIS, SCOTT W. FOLEY, ESQ., SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, NATIONAL INSURANCE PRODUCER REGISTRY, JOEL I. SHER, ESQ., ANASTASIA L. MCCUSKER, ESQ., CHERYL HINES, RICHARD M. GOLDBERG, ESQ., SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL III LLC, SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT, P.A. and ESQ. DAVID B. APPLEFELD
Case Number: 2:2019cv05952
Filed: December 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/30/20. 1/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (va, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, SHE MUST, NO LATER THAN JANUARY 22, 2020, EITHER (1) PAY $400 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE PLAINTIFF WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. PLAINTIFF MAY USE THIS FORM TO SEEK LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IF SHE CANNOT AFFORD TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE; AND, IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, WE MAY DISMISS HER CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/23/19. 12/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH IFP FORM. (va, )
December 14, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jl, )
December 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ELIZABETH COOMES. (jl, )
December 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMBASSADOR LUIS GUINOT, JR., RAYMOND ANDERSON, DAVID B. APPLEFELD, ESQ, ALEX J. BROWN, ESQ, WILLIAM E. CARLSON, ESQ, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, ECKERT SEAMANS CHERIN & MELLOTT, LLC, SCOTT W. FOLEY, ESQ, J. PATRICK GILL, ESQ, RICHARD M. GOLDBERG, ESQ, ANN CLARY GORDON, ESQ, LAWRENCE JEFFREY GROSS, ERIC R. HARLAN, ESQ, CHERYL HINES, IOANNIS LASKARIS, MARYLAND INSURANCE ADMINISTRATION, ANASTASIA L. MCCUSKER, MARK L. MILLER, RDQ, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS, NATIONAL INSURANCE PRODUCER REGISTRY, DOUGLAS PALAIS, PARK PALAIS LLC, RENEE S. LANE KUNZ, ESQ., PAUL MARK SANDLER, ESQ, SHAPIRO SHER, SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL II LLC, SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL III LLC, SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT, P.A., SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER, SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER, P.A., JOEL I. SHER, ESQ, SILVERMAN THOMPSON SLUTKIN & WHITE LLC, STATE OF MARYLAND, VIRGINIA BUREAU OF INSURANCE, VIRGINIA STATE CORPORATION COMMISSION, DANIEL J. ZELLER, ESQ, filed by ELIZABETH COOMES. (FEE NOT PAID), JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, ) (No Envelope Provided) Modified on 12/19/2019 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOMES v. ECKERT SEAMANS CHERIN & MELLOT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARK PALAIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN CLARY GORDON, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECKERT SEAMANS CHERIN & MELLOTT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE JEFFREY GROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK L. MILLER, RDQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGINIA STATE CORPORATION COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBASSADOR LUIS GUINOT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESQ. DOUGLAS PALAIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARYLAND INSURANCE ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGINIA BUREAU OF INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILVERMAN THOMPSON SLUTKIN & WHITE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC R. HARLAN, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX J. BROWN, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL J. ZELLER, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM E. CARLSON, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. PATRICK GILL, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE S. LANE KUNZ, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL MARK SANDLER, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESQ. IOANNIS LASKARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT W. FOLEY, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL INSURANCE PRODUCER REGISTRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL I. SHER, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANASTASIA L. MCCUSKER, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL HINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD M. GOLDBERG, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL III LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESQ. DAVID B. APPLEFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH COOMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?