Tobin et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: IRA MEYERS and TERESA TOBIN
Defendant: ETHICON INC, C R BARD INC and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv40001
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 43 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-29130. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 26, 2019 Filing 42 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy transferring the actions on this conditional remand order for remand to its/their respective transferor court; the transferee court in this litigation has advised the Panel that coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings in the actions on this conditional remand order have been completed and that remand to the transferor court(s), as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1407(a). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 4/26/2019. (cc: attys) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ira Meyers, Teresa Tobin (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 39 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 239 - MASTER ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT ETHICON, INC. TO FIRST AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT. (ras)_13906847_1, #2 Exhibit ECF 240 - MASTER ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT ETHICON LLC TO FIRST AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit ECF 241 - MASTER ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON TO FIRST AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT. (ras), #4 Exhibit ECF 1986 - AMENDED MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Thomas C. Wright, Jr.,, #5 Exhibit ECF 1988 - MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of 1986 AMENDED MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF 2050 - MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Nicole Fleischmann, M.D, #7 Exhibit ECF 2051 - MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of 2050 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Certain, #8 Exhibit ECF 2060 - MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude the Opinions of FDA Expert Timothy Ulatowski. (Attachment, #9 Exhibit ECF 2065 - MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of 2060 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude the Opi, #10 Exhibit ECF 2134 - RESPONSE by Ethicon Women_s Health & Urology, J&J in oppos to 2060 DAUBERT MOTION by Certai, #11 Exhibit ECF 2143 - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS_ AMENDED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. THOMAS C., #12 Exhibit ECF 2206 - MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of 2205 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Op, #13 Exhibit ECF 2230 - REPLY by All Plaintiffs to 2050 MOTION by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 1 Cases to Exclude Cer, #14 Exhibit ECF 2232 - Plaintiffs_ Reply Brief in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude FDA Expert Timothy Ulat, #15 Exhibit ECF 2287 - RESPONSE by Ethicon Women_s Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson in opposition to 2205 D, #16 Exhibit ECF 2297 - REPLY by All Plaintiffs to 2287 Response In Opposition,,. (Attachments_ #1 Exhibit(s) AA, #17 Exhibit ECF 2825 - Motion to Exclude or limit the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maclean PHD PE, #18 Exhibit ECF 2826 - Memorandum in support to Exclude or Limit the opinions and testimony of Steven Maclean PHD PE, #19 Exhibit ECF 2910 - NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE AND NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF PRIOR DAUBERT RESPONSE REGARDING TI, #20 Exhibit ECF 2942 - RESPONSE by Defendants IN OPPISITION TO PLAINTIFFS_ MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIM, #21 Exhibit ECF 3019 - REPLY by Ethicon in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D., #22 Exhibit ECF 3053 - REPLY by ALL Plaintiffs in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Tes, #23 Exhibit ECF 3592 - Motion to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #24 Exhibit ECF 3594 - MEMORANDUM by Ethicon Women_s Health & Urology, Ethicon, LLC, et al. in support of (3592) MOT, #25 Exhibit ECF 3621 - MEMORANDUM of Law in SUpport of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev, #26 Exhibit ECF 3630 - MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Limit Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge, #27 Exhibit ECF 3788 - MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to (3592) MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclu, #28 Exhibit ECF 3844 - REPLY TO NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Thomas C. Wright, Jr., M.D. for Wave, #29 Exhibit ECF 3845 - REPLY by Ethicon Women_s Health and Urology, Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to 3592 MOTION, #30 Exhibit ECF 3855 - REPLY IN SUPPORT of Motion to Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge by Ethicon, Ethicon Women_s Health & Urology, et al._36441101_1, #31 Exhibit ECF 3865 - REPLY IN SUPPORT of Motion to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D. by, #32 Exhibit ECF 4355 - MOTION to Exclude CERTAIN GENERAL OPINIONS OF BOBBY SHULL, M.D. by Ethicon Women_s Health & U, #33 Exhibit ECF 4361 - MEMORANDUM by Ethicon Women_s Health & Urology, Ethicon, LLC, et al. in support of (4355) MOT, #34 Exhibit ECF 4554 - RESPONSE by Certain Plaintiffs in opposition to 4355 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Bo, #35 Exhibit ECF 4625 - REPLY by Ethicon Women_s Health & Urology, Ethicon, LLC, et al. to (4355) MOTION to Exclude C, #36 Exhibit ECF 6648 - NOTICE of Adoption of Ethicon_s Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med, #37 Exhibit ECF 6786 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Motion to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D., for Wave 8 by Ethicon,, #38 Exhibit ECF 6798 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Nicole Fleischmann, M.D. for Wave 8 by All Plai, #39 Exhibit ECF 6824 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Steven MacLean, Ph.D, P.E. for Wave 8 by All Pl, #40 Exhibit ECF 6827 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bobby Shull, #41 Exhibit ECF 6833 - Amended Notice of Adoption of Ethicon's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge Filed in Wave 4, #42 Exhibit ECF 6860 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Timothy Ulatowski, M.D. for Wave 8 by All Plain, #43 Exhibit ECF 6864 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Thomas C. Wright, Jr., M.D. for Wave 8 by All P, #44 Exhibit ECF 6875 - MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of 6874 MOTION by Ethicon,, #45 Exhibit ECF 6876 - DAUBERT MOTION to Preclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Opinions and Testimony of C., #46 Exhibit ECF 6877 - MEMORANDUM OF LAW by All Plaintiffs in support of (6876) MOTION to Preclude of Limit Opinions, #47 Exhibit ECF 6924 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Alan Garely, M.D. for Wave 8 by All Plaintiffs_44700729_1, #48 Exhibit ECF 6930 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Suzanne Parisian, M.D. for Wave 8 by All Plai, #49 Exhibit ECF 6961 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Bobby Shull, M.D. for Wave 8 by All Plaintiff, #50 Exhibit ECF 6965 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Regarding Timothy Ulatowski for Wave 8 by Ethico, #51 Exhibit ECF 6973 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Thomas C. Wright, Jr., M.D. for Wave 8 by Eth, #52 Exhibit ECF 6998 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Steven Maclean, M.D. for Wave 8 by Ethicon, J, #53 Exhibit ECF 7019 - Defendants_ Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Nicole Fleischmann, M.D. for Wave, #54 Exhibit ECF 7045 - RESPONSE by Cheryl Berden (WVSD CA 2,14-21966) Mark Berden, #55 Exhibit ECF 7085 - NOTICE of Amended Adoption of Prior Daubert Response and Opposition to Defendant Ethicon_s Mo, #56 Exhibit ECF 7100 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Steven MacLean, Ph.D. for Wave 8 by All Plaintif, #57 Exhibit ECF 7119 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Thomas C. Wright, M.D. for Wave 8 by All Plainti, #58 Exhibit ECF 7123 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply Regarding Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge for Wave 8 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re (3855) Reply to Response, #59 Exhibit ECF 7143 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Timothy Ulatowski, M.D. for Wave 8 by All Plaint, #60 Exhibit ECF 7183 - REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to 7085 Notice (Other),. (Gage, William)_44850262_1, #61 Exhibit ECF 7440 - NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Nicole Fleischmann, MD for Wave 8 by All Plainti, #62 Exhibit Segment 001 of ECF 2205 - MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.., #63 Exhibit Segment 002 of ECF 2205 - MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.., #64 Exhibit Segment 003 of ECF 2205 - MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.., #65 Exhibit Segment 004 of ECF 2205 - MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.., #66 Exhibit Segment 005 of ECF 2205 - MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.., #67 Exhibit Segment 001 of ECF 6874 - MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Vladirmir Iakovlev, #68 Exhibit Segment 002 of ECF 6874 - MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Vladirmir Iakovlev, #69 Exhibit Segment 003 of ECF 6874 - MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Vladirmir Iakovlev, #70 Exhibit Segment 001 of ECF 7020 - OPPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to 6876 DAUBERT MOTION by Certain Plaintiffs t, #71 Exhibit Segment 002 of ECF 7020 - OPPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to 6876 DAUBERT MOTION by Certain Plaintiffs t)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 38 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 219, #2 Exhibit 220, #3 Exhibit 221, #4 Exhibit 223, #5 Exhibit 235, #6 Exhibit 261, #7 Exhibit 262, #8 Exhibit 263, #9 Exhibit 264, #10 Exhibit 266, #11 Exhibit 933, #12 Exhibit 934, #13 Exhibit 3128, #14 Exhibit 3950, #15 Exhibit 5235, #16 Exhibit 5313, #17 Exhibit 5328, #18 Exhibit 5414, #19 Exhibit 5581, #20 Exhibit 5668, #21 Exhibit 6787, #22 Exhibit 6788, #23 Exhibit 6789, #24 Exhibit 6800, #25 Exhibit 6801, #26 Exhibit 6803, #27 Exhibit 6804, #28 Exhibit 6806, #29 Exhibit 6812, #30 Exhibit 6817, #31 Exhibit 6818, #32 Exhibit 6826, #33 Exhibit 6828, #34 Exhibit 6829, #35 Exhibit 6831, #36 Exhibit 6837, #37 Exhibit 6845, #38 Exhibit 6847, #39 Exhibit 6848, #40 Exhibit 6849, #41 Exhibit 6850, #42 Exhibit 6851, #43 Exhibit 6853, #44 Exhibit 6855, #45 Exhibit 6856, #46 Exhibit 6857, #47 Exhibit 6858, #48 Exhibit 6859, #49 Exhibit 6861, #50 Exhibit 6862, #51 Exhibit 6863, #52 Exhibit 6924, #53 Exhibit 6925, #54 Exhibit 6927, #55 Exhibit 6928, #56 Exhibit 6929, #57 Exhibit 6930, #58 Exhibit 6932, #59 Exhibit 6934, #60 Exhibit 6936, #61 Exhibit 6938, #62 Exhibit 6940, #63 Exhibit 6945, #64 Exhibit 6950, #65 Exhibit 6951, #66 Exhibit 6953, #67 Exhibit 6955, #68 Exhibit 6956, #69 Exhibit 6957, #70 Exhibit 6959, #71 Exhibit 6961, #72 Exhibit 6962, #73 Exhibit 6963, #74 Exhibit 6964, #75 Exhibit 6988, #76 Exhibit 7038, #77 Exhibit 7090, #78 Exhibit 7113, #79 Exhibit 7116, #80 Exhibit 7144, #81 Exhibit 7639, #82 Exhibit 6843, #83 Exhibit 6958, #84 Exhibit 6926, #85 Exhibit 6960)(Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
April 21, 2019 Filing 37 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 219, #2 220, #3 238)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AND SUGGESTION OF REMAND FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A: Upon receipt of an order to remand from the Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and the timely filing of any joint designations of the MDL 2327 record by counsel in the individual case, the Clerk of this court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, is ORDERED that on 4/21/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be remanded to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A; on or before 4/21/2019 the parties are ORDERED to confer and to file all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider, as more fully directed herein; any joint motion to dismiss may be ruled upon and any proper stipulation of dismissal may close a case prior to remand; on the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to utilize the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and remand it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after remand of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #31 Response in Opposition. (Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 11/4/2018 to remove #32 memorandum) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM by Ira Meyers, Teresa Tobin in opposition to #29 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 31 OPPOSITION by Ira Meyers, Teresa Tobin to #29 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #29 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2018 to convert to a motion for partial summary judgment)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITIONS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family: Ira Meyers; Rose Pillo Bennett; Carla Pillo Red; Gabrielle Meyers; Gregory Maxwell Meyers on a Date to Be Determined (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Teresa Tobin on 8/29/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Higginbotham, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Dr. Miles Murphy. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Miles Murphy on 6/22/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Teresa Tobin on 6/20/18 at 2:00 p.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Miles Murphy on 3/5/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mks) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Ira Meyers, Teresa Tobin. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
March 25, 2015 Filing 16 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Ira Meyers, Teresa Tobin against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 MOTION by Ira Meyers, Teresa Tobin to Withdraw #4 Motion to Remand; and denying as moot #4 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/24/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 23, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 20, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION by Ira Meyers, Teresa Tobin to Withdraw #4 Motion to Remand (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
February 5, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Melissa Foster Bird on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Bird, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 8, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 5, 2014 Filing 9 REPLY by Ira Meyers, Teresa Tobin to #5 Response In Opposition. (Tiger, Michelle) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 8 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 157 (Final Order Regarding Severance of Actions) entered on 11/19/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:14-cv-06247. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
November 25, 2014 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-150) THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF WEST VIRGINIA FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. &1407; ETC. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
November 25, 2014 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MURPHY, KENNETH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by IRA MEYERS, TERESA TOBIN.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(TIGER, MICHELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Short Form Complaint by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(GRAFF, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
October 31, 2014 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ETHICON WOMEN'S HEALTH AND UROLOGY, ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(jmv, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]
October 31, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ETHICON WOMEN'S HEALTH AND UROLOGY, ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON from Court of Common Pleas Phila, case number June 2014, No. 140603983. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE110528); Cert of Serv. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A, #2 Exh. B, #3 Exh. C, #4 Exh. D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmv, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobin et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRA MEYERS
Represented By: LEE B. BALEFSKY
Represented By: CLAYTON A. CLARK
Represented By: MICHELLE L. TIGER
Represented By: PRISCILLA E. JIMENEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA TOBIN
Represented By: LEE B. BALEFSKY
Represented By: CLAYTON A. CLARK
Represented By: MICHELLE L. TIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON INC
Represented By: MELISSA A. MERK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: KARI L. SUTHERLAND
Represented By: DAVID B. THOMAS
Represented By: KENNETH A. MURPHY
Represented By: SUSAN M. ROBINSON
Represented By: CHRISTY D. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R BARD INC
Represented By: RICHARD B. NORTH, JR.
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: MELISSA A. MERK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: KARI L. SUTHERLAND
Represented By: DAVID B. THOMAS
Represented By: KENNETH A. MURPHY
Represented By: SUSAN M. ROBINSON
Represented By: CHRISTY D. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?