WILKINSON LANGHORNE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP v. RUBY TUESDAY, INC.
Plaintiff: WILKINSON LANGHORNE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Defendant: RUBY TUESDAY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00095
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by RUBY TUESDAY, INC..Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(POPPER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: THAT THE MOTION #4 IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 21, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/28/2020. 1/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sme, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by RUBY TUESDAY, INC..certificate of service.(POPPER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER POPPER on behalf of RUBY TUESDAY, INC. with Certificate of Service.(POPPER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 1/24/2020 (tjd).
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILKINSON LANGHORNE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP re: Robert Gooden served Summons and Complaint upon WILKINSON LANGHORNE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP by hand delivery on Registered Agent. WILKINSON LANGHORNE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(ANDERSEN, BENJAMIN)
January 6, 2020 1 Summons Issued as to RUBY TUESDAY, INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 1/7/20 (bw, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RUBY TUESDAY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE209256.), filed by WILKINSON LANGHORNE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.(bw, ) Modified on 1/7/2020 (bw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILKINSON LANGHORNE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP v. RUBY TUESDAY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILKINSON LANGHORNE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: BENJAMIN A. ANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUBY TUESDAY, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER POPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?