PHILADELPHIA ENTERTAINMENT AND DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LP v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE et al
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA ENTERTAINMENT AND DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LP
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE and COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00295
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 Appellant's BRIEF by PHILADELPHIA ENTERTAINMENT AND DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LP. Appellee Brief due by 4/13/2020. (COZEN, STEPHEN)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by PHILADELPHIA ENTERTAINMENT AND DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LP. Appellee Brief due by 4/13/2020.**(FILED IN ERROR, INCORRECT PDF, ATTY TO REFILE)** (COZEN, STEPHEN) Modified on 3/13/2020 (tjd).
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 Briefing Schedule. 2/14/20 Entered and copies e-mailed. (kw, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 2 Original Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received. (Attachments: #1 Designation Notice of Appeal, #2 Designation Items 1 to 7 Part 1, #3 Designation Items 1 to 7 Part 2, #4 Designation Items 8 to 14 and 29 to 38, #5 Court of Appeals Documents - 23 to 27 on designation, #6 District No. 9 - Designation 15, #7 District No 10 Part 1 - Designation 15, #8 District No 10 Part 2 - Designation 15, #9 District No 10 Part 3 - Designation 15, #10 District No 10 Part 4 - Designation 15, #11 District No 10 Part 5 - Designation 15, #12 District No 10 Part 6 - Designation 15, #13 District No 10 Part 7 - Designation 15, #14 District No 10 Part 8 - Designation 15, #15 District No 10 Part 9 - Designation 15, #16 District No 10 Part 10 - Designation 15, #17 District No 14 to 29 - Designation 16 to 22 and 28, #18 Entire Docket Notice of Appeal Order Under Appeal, #19 Transmission Sheet)(kw, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of PHILADELPHIA ENTERTAINMENT AND DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LP from the order of Bankruptcy Judge MAGDELINE D. COLEMAN filed on 12/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 DOCKET, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILADELPHIA ENTERTAINMENT AND DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LP v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA ENTERTAINMENT AND DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LP
Represented By: JENNIFER M. MCHUGH
Represented By: JARED DIMOCK BAYER
Represented By: STEPHEN A. COZEN
Represented By: FRED WARREN JACOBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Represented By: JON THEODORE PEARSON
Represented By: BRUCE P. MERENSTEIN
Represented By: ALBERT S. DANDRIDGE, III.
Represented By: VINCENT J. MARRIOTT, III
Represented By: DANIEL M. PEREIRA
Represented By: RICHARD A. BARKASY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: JON THEODORE PEARSON
Represented By: BRUCE P. MERENSTEIN
Represented By: ALBERT S. DANDRIDGE, III.
Represented By: VINCENT J. MARRIOTT, III
Represented By: DANIEL M. PEREIRA
Represented By: RICHARD A. BARKASY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?