PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU v. NATURE'S PRODUCE, L.L.C et al
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU
Defendant: LORETTA A SOMMERS, JEFFREY R SOMMERS and NATURE'S PRODUCE, L.L.C
Case Number: 2:2020cv00371
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND THE PARTIES' "CONSENT ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINIARY INJUNCTION" AND "STIPULATED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF CONSENT ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ETC. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THE $100 BOND SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S FEBRUARY 3, 2020, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL REMAIN POSTED WITH THE CLERK OF COURT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/11/20. 3/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU. (jaa, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Motion Hearing held on 3/5/20 Court Reporter: ESR. (jl, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Motion Hearing held on 2/3/20 ESR(jl, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU re #18 Stipulation, (FASSETT, MARY)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Stipulated Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in Support of Consent Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU. (FASSETT, MARY)
March 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by CARRIE J BOYLE on behalf of NATURE'S PRODUCE, L.L.C (rf, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mary Jean Fassett re: served Court Order entered 2/28/2020 upon Carrie J. Boyle, Esq., Authorized Agent for Nature's Produce, LLC, Jeffrey R. Sommers, Loretta A. Sommers by Overnight Delivery; Electronic Mail on 3/2/2020 (FASSETT, MARY)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE 2/3/20 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL BE EXTENDED AND REMAIN IN EFFECT THROUGH 3/13/20. MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/5/2020 01:30 PM. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/28/20. 2/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS GRANTED AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL BE EXTENDED AND REMAIN IN EFFECT THROUGH 2/28/20. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/14/20. 2/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 2/14/2020 (rf, ).
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steven Sachs re: served Summons, Complaint, Temporary Restraining Order upon Carrie J. Boyle, Esq., Authorized Agent for Nature's Produce, LLC c/o Crystal Vitullo by Substituted on 2/13/2020 (FASSETT, MARY)
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION Extension of Temporary Restraining Order re #9 Temporary Restraining Order filed by PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FASSETT, MARY)
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steven Sachs re: served Summons, Complaint, Temporary Restraining Order upon Loretta A. Sommers c/o Sandy Camper by Substituted on 2/05/2020 (FASSETT, MARY)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Steven Sachs re: served Summons, Complaint, Temporary Restraining Order upon Jeffrey R. Sommers c/o Sandy Camper by Substituted on 2/05/2020 (FASSETT, MARY)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/3/2020. 2/3/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(stwe, )
February 3, 2020 The sum of $ PPE210679 deposited into the Registry of the Court. (rf, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mary Jean Fassett re: served Motion for TRO, Motion for PI, Memorandum in Support, Declaration in Support with Exhibits, Copy of Complaint, Order Setting Hearing by Overnight Delivery; Electronic Mail on 1/30/2020, 1/31/2020 (FASSETT, MARY)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT MOTION HEARING SET FOR 2/3/2020 10:30 AM. FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF ITS COMPLAINT, MOTIONS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND THIS ORDER ON DEFENDANTS PRIOR TO THE HEARING. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/30/20. 1/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. *COPY OF THIS ORDER TO BE SERVED ON DEFEDNANTS' BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL*(rf, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 Declaration re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Leonard Valente by PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Assignments, #2 Exhibit 2, PACA Licenses, #3 Exhibit 3, Credit App and Personal Gty, #4 Exhibit 4, 2000 Lbs, #5 Exhibit 5a, BRS Part 1, #6 Exhibit 5a, BRS Part 2, #7 Exhibit 5a BRS Part 3, #8 Exhibit 5a, BRS Part 4, #9 Exhibit 5b, Collotti Part 1, #10 Exhibit 5b, Collotti Part 2, #11 Exhibit 5b, Collotti Part 3, #12 Exhibit 5c Colonial Part 1, #13 Exhibit 5c Colonial Part 2, #14 Exhibit 5d Coosemans Part 1, #15 Exhibit 5d Coosemans Part 2, #16 Exhibit 5d Coosemans Part 3, #17 Exhibit 5d Coosemans Part 4, #18 Exhibit 5d Coosemans Part 5, #19 Exhibit 5e G&G, #20 Exhibit 5f Kean Part 1, #21 Exhibit 5f Kean Part 2, #22 Exhibit 5f Kean Part 3, #23 Exhibit 5f Kean Part 4, #24 Exhibit 5g Klinghoffer Part 1, #25 Exhibit 5g Klinghoffer Part 2, #26 Exhibit 5g Klinghoffer Part 3, #27 Exhibit 5g Klinghoffer Part 4, #28 Exhibit 5g Klinghoffer Part 5, #29 Exhibit 5h Kovacevich part 1, #30 Exhibit 5h Kovacevich part 2, #31 Exhibit 5h Kovacevich part 3, #32 Exhibit 5h Kovacevich part 4, #33 Exhibit 5h Kovacevich part 5, #34 Exhibit 5h Kovacevich part 6, #35 Exhibit 5h Kovacevich part 7, #36 Exhibit 5h Kovacevich part 8, #37 Exhibit 5i Levin part 1, #38 Exhibit 5i Levin part 2, #39 Exhibit 5j Nardella, #40 Exhibit 5k North American part 1, #41 Exhibit 5k North American part 2, #42 Exhibit 5k North American part 3, #43 Exhibit 5l Procacci Part 1, #44 Exhibit 5l Procacci Part 2, #45 Exhibit 5l Procacci Part 3, #46 Exhibit 5m Vena Part 1, #47 Exhibit 5m Vena Part 2, #48 Exhibit 5m Vena Part 3, #49 Exhibit 5n Wick Part 1, #50 Exhibit 5n Wick Part 2)(FASSETT, MARY)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum of Law re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU. (FASSETT, MARY)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU.Certificate of Service.(FASSETT, MARY)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FASSETT, MARY)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU.(FASSETT, MARY)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATURE'S PRODUCE, L.L.C, JEFFREY R SOMMERS, LORETTA A SOMMERS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE210144.), filed by PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(rf, )
January 22, 2020 3 Original Summons Issued as to NATURE'S PRODUCE, L.L.C, JEFFREY R SOMMERS, LORETTA A SOMMERS forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 1/22/20.(rf, )
January 22, 2020 Case Eligible for Arbitration(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU v. NATURE'S PRODUCE, L.L.C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORETTA A SOMMERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY R SOMMERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATURE'S PRODUCE, L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA PRODUCE CREDIT BUREAU
Represented By: MARY JEAN FASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?