BAXLEY v. SAUL
Plaintiff: NASHA BAXLEY
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv00403
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by NASHA BAXLEY.(IMBESI, STEPHANIE) Modified on 3/9/2020 (tjd).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE ETC. AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND PLAINTIFF A SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/6/20.2/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF WITH FORMS AND EMAILED.(jaa, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS RANDOMLY REASSIGNED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE NITZA I. QUINONES ALEJANDRO, DISTRICT JUDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/29/20. 1/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by NASHA BAXLEY.. (IMBESI, STEPHANIE)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(bw, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by NASHA BAXLEY.(bw, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by NASHA BAXLEY..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAXLEY v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NASHA BAXLEY
Represented By: STEPHANIE M. IMBESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?