MARTIN v. NTT DATA, INC.
Petitioner: SARAH MARTIN
Respondent: NTT DATA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00686
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 19 Memorandum in Further Support of Petition to Vacate the Jams Arbitration Award by SARAH MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (MATTIACCI, LAURA)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 Exhibits 1 Through 12 to Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Petition to Vacated. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (fb, ).
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/9/20. 3/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT RESPONDENT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/9/20. 3/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 Response in Opposition re #1 Complaint (Attorney) Response to Petition to Vacate and Cross-Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award by NTT DATA, INC.. (SCHROEDER, DONALD)
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including NTT DATA International L.L.C. with I, Donald W. Schroeder, an attorney, hereby certify that on March 9, 2020, I caused the foregoing document to be served on counsel of record via the Court's Electronic Case Filing system by NTT DATA, INC..(SCHROEDER, DONALD)
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Document Unopposed Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal to Respondent's Cross-Petition and accompanying Memorandum of Law filed by NTT DATA, INC..Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(SCHROEDER, DONALD)
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD W. SCHROEDER on behalf of NTT DATA, INC. with Certificate of Appearance(SCHROEDER, DONALD)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH R. IMBROGNO on behalf of NTT DATA, INC. with Certificate of Appearance(IMBROGNO, LEAH)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DONALD W. SCHROEDER, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. DONALD W. SCHROEDER, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS ACTION ONLY ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT IN THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/20/20. 2/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (W/ECF FORM) AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) Modified on 2/28/2020 (mbh, ).(FEE PAID ON 2/27/20)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Donald W. Schroeder filed by NTT DATA, INC..Certificate of Service.(IMBROGNO, LEAH)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED AND THE TIME WITHIN WHICH RESPONDENT HAS TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD IS EXTENDED TO MARCH 9, 2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 02/18/2020. 02/19/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Attorney) filed by NTT DATA, INC..Certificate of Service.(IMBROGNO, LEAH)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH R. IMBROGNO on behalf of NTT DATA, INC. (IMBROGNO, LEAH)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by SARAH MARTIN. Amended Certificate of Service for Motion to File Under Seal. (MATTIACCI, LAURA)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by SARAH MARTIN. Amended Certificate of Service for Petition to Vacate. (MATTIACCI, LAURA)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 Exhibits 1 through 9 to Petitioner's Petition to Vacate the Arbitration Award. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2020: #1 Exhibit 5-9) (fb, ).
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits 1 through 9 attached to Petitioners Motion to Vacate the Arbitration Award and accompanying Memorandum of Law (Filed Under Seal) filed by SARAH MARTIN..(MATTIACCI, LAURA)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 Petition to Vacate and Memorandum of Law ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14093433.), filed by SARAH MARTIN.(MATTIACCI, LAURA) Modified on 2/6/2020 (fb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIN v. NTT DATA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NTT DATA, INC.
Represented By: DONALD W. SCHROEDER
Represented By: LEAH R. IMBROGNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SARAH MARTIN
Represented By: LAURA CARLIN MATTIACCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?