Molina Healthcare, Inc. v. Actavis Elizabeth, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Molina Healthcare, Inc.
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC, Camber Pharmaceutical, Inc., MYLAN INC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO. INC., Inc Pfizer, ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN N.V, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., WEST--WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., APOTEX CORP., CITRON PHARMA LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, PERRIGO COMPANY PLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK INC., TELIGENT INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., SANDOZ INC, TARO PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,, UDL LABORATORIES INC., AKORN INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., GREENSTONE LLC, EPIC PHARMA LLC, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., VERSAPHARM INC. and MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00695
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
March 17, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN)
March 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
March 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
March 17, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY C. PORCELLI on behalf of AKORN INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO. INC., VERSAPHARM INC. (PORCELLI, ANTHONY)
March 17, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY D FITTS on behalf of AKORN INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO. INC., VERSAPHARM INC. (FITTS, AMY)
March 12, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC with Certificate of Service(TALADAY, JOHN)
March 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK THOMAS KOONS on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC with Certificate of Service(KOONS, ERIK)
March 12, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC with Certificate of Service(WILSON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by GRANT R. MACQUEEN on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(MACQUEEN, GRANT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIA PENG on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(PENG, VICTORIA)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Pensa Investments, S.L., Towa Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. with Certificate of Service by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..(MAHONEY, STACEY)
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY ANNE MAHONEY on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAHONEY, STACEY)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/13/2020. 2/14/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER #1232 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-08438. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (CTO-10) TRANSFERRING CASE to the USDC-Eastern Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge John Nichols on 2/5/20. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020) Modified on 2/6/2020 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Holdco US, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Akorn, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Apotex Corp., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Camber Pharmaceutical, Inc., Citron Pharma, LLC, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Endo International PLC, Epic Pharma, LLC, Fougera Pharmaceuticals Inc., G&W Laboratories, Inc., Generics Bidco I, LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Greenstone LLC, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc., Impax Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Lannett Company, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mayne Pharma, Inc., Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,, Mylan, Inc., Mylan, N.V., Oceanside Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Perrigo Company plc, Perrigo New York, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teligent, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., UDL Laboratories Inc., Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC, Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, Versapharm, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Wockhardt USA LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Defendants List)(Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 1/13/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERECE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/9/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Molina Healthcare, Inc... (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 1/3/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Molina Healthcare, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Molina Healthcare, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Utah, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of California, Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of California Partner Plan, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Florida, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Illinois, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Kentucky, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Michigan, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Mississippi, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Missouri, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Ohio, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Puerto Rico, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of South Carolina, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Texas, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Texas Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Virginia, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Washington, Inc., Other Affiliate Molina Healthcare of Wisconsin, Inc. for Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 1/3/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 12/27/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Holdco US, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Akorn, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Apotex Corp., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Camber Pharmaceutical, Inc., Citron Pharma, LLC, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Endo International PLC, Epic Pharma, LLC, Fougera Pharmaceuticals Inc., G&W Laboratories, Inc., Generics Bidco I, LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Greenstone LLC, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc., Impax Pharmaceuticals, LLC f/k/a Impax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lannett Company, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mayne Pharma, Inc., Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,, Mylan, Inc., Mylan, N.V., Oceanside Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Perrigo Company plc, Perrigo New York, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teligent, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., UDL Laboratories Inc., Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC, Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, Versapharm, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Wockhardt USA LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14020718.). Filed byMolina Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 12/27/2019) Modified on 1/2/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 2/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina Healthcare, Inc. v. Actavis Elizabeth, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camber Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO. INC.
Represented By: AMY D FITTS
Represented By: ANTHONY C. PORCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: VICTORIA PENG
Represented By: STACEY ANNE MAHONEY
Represented By: GRANT R. MACQUEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC.
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST--WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO COMPANY PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD.
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL LABORATORIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKORN INC.
Represented By: AMY D FITTS
Represented By: ANTHONY C. PORCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: NATHAN M. BUCHTER
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSTONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERSAPHARM INC.
Represented By: AMY D FITTS
Represented By: ANTHONY C. PORCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molina Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: TODD M. SCHNEIDER
Represented By: KYLE G. BATES
Represented By: LEE YUN KIM
Represented By: JASON H. KIM
Represented By: PETER D. ST. PHILLIP
Represented By: JENNIFER RISENER
Represented By: LAURA KILLIAN MUMMERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?