CESAR CASTILLO, INC. et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Plaintiff: KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC. and KINNEY DRUGS
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, SANDOZ, INC., VERSAPHARM, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, PFIZER, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I LLC, TORRENT PHARMA INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., GREENSTONE LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC, G&W LABORATORIES, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ALVOGEN INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC., DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., CITRON PHARMA LLC, MYLAN INC., MALLINCKRODT INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA., INC., BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., HIKMA LABS, INC., AKORN INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00721
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA., INC. with Certificate of Service(TALADAY, JOHN)
April 3, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK THOMAS KOONS on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA., INC. with Certificate of Service(KOONS, ERIK)
April 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA., INC. with Certificate of Service(WILSON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 31, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS DUBE on behalf of MALLINCKRODT INC. (DUBE, NICHOLAS)
March 31, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JANE E. WILLIS on behalf of MALLINCKRODT INC. (WILLIS, JANE)
March 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
March 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Cetificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
March 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN)
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY C. PORCELLI on behalf of AKORN INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., VERSAPHARM, INC. (PORCELLI, ANTHONY)
March 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY D FITTS on behalf of AKORN INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., VERSAPHARM, INC. (FITTS, AMY)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Alvogen Pharma US, Inc. with Certificate of Service by ALVOGEN INC..(KEELEY, MICHAEL)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG M. REISER on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(REISER, CRAIG)
March 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M. MATHIAS on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(MATHIAS, EDWARD)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL ADCOX on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(ADCOX, RACHEL)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. KEELEY on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(KEELEY, MICHAEL)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA MARIE KAAS on behalf of JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(KAAS, LISA)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY A. RIST on behalf of JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. with Certificate of Service(RIST, JEREMY)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/11/2020. 3/12/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO CIVIL ACTION 20-721)(kp, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GRANT R. MACQUEEN on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(MACQUEEN, GRANT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIA PENG on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(PENG, VICTORIA)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Pensa Investments, S.L., Towa Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. with Certificate of Service by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..(MAHONEY, STACEY)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY ANNE MAHONEY on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAHONEY, STACEY)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 UN-REDACTED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(bw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document) (md, ). (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/11/2020) (md, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #4 Sealed Document - Exhibit E) (md, ). Modified on 2/11/2020 (md).
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 REDACTED COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN INC., ALVOGEN INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GREENSTONE LLC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., HIKMA LABS, INC., HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC, JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MALLINCKRODT INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PFIZER, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA., INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TORRENT PHARMA INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, INC., VERSAPHARM, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE211072.), filed by CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit REDACTED E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(bw, )
February 7, 2020 50 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC, ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN INC., ALVOGEN INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GREENSTONE LLC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., HIKMA LABS, INC., HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC, JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MALLINCKRODT INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PFIZER, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA., INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TORRENT PHARMA INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, INC., VERSAPHARM, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 2/11/2020 (bw, )
February 7, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CESAR CASTILLO, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.. (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CESAR CASTILLO, INC. et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CESAR CASTILLO, INC.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINNEY DRUGS
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERSAPHARM, INC.
Represented By: AMY D FITTS
Represented By: ANTHONY C. PORCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERICS BIDCO I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENT PHARMA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC.
Represented By: AMY D FITTS
Represented By: ANTHONY C. PORCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSTONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: LISA MARIE KAAS
Represented By: JEREMY A. RIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVOGEN INC.
Represented By: RACHEL ADCOX
Represented By: EDWARD M. MATHIAS
Represented By: CRAIG M. REISER
Represented By: MICHAEL L. KEELEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: VICTORIA PENG
Represented By: STACEY ANNE MAHONEY
Represented By: GRANT R. MACQUEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT INC.
Represented By: JANE E. WILLIS
Represented By: NICHOLAS DUBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA., INC.
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIKMA LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKORN INC.
Represented By: AMY D FITTS
Represented By: ANTHONY C. PORCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: NATHAN M. BUCHTER
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?