FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al v. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY et al
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA and FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Defendant: ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK and THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY
Petitioner: NON-PARTY Elkins Crest Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Tandigm Health, LLC, MAIN LINE HEALTH, GENESIS HEALTHCARE, CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, SHANNONDELL, INC., INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, Kessler Institute for Rehabilitation, NON-PARTY SABER HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, Kindred Healthcare, LLC, ST. MARY REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, AETNA, INC., HEALTH PARTNERS PLANS, INC., PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. and TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM
Material Witness: AristaCare Health Services
Case Number: 2:2020cv01113
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0053
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 DOC. 290 MAILED TO ATTORNEYS WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESSES. (sg, )
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORKS MOTION FOR A FINDING OF CIVIL CONTEMPT BY NON-PARTY PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. (ECF 207) IS DENIED; NON-PARTY AETNA, INC.S MOTION TO PARTIALLY SEAL AETNA EXHIBITS AND FOR FURTHER RELIEF REGARDING OTHER DOCUMENTS (ECF 286) IS DENIED; NON-PARTY UNITEDHEALTH GROUPS MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION (ECF 287) IS GRANTED ONLY WITH RESPECT TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) DX0450; (2) THE REDACTIONS TO DX0402 CONTAINED IN ECF 287-4 (UNITED ATTACHMENT D); AND (3) THE REDACTIONS TO DX9498 CONTAINED IN ECF 287-7 (UNITED ATTACHMENT G) AND THE MOTION IS DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/26/21.3/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER of USCA THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE, THE MATTER IS HEREBY DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FED. R. APP. P. 42(B), WITHOUT COST TO EITHER PARTY. A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS ORDER IS ISSUED IN LIEU OF A FORMAL MANDATE (jaa, )
January 19, 2021 Copy of Order/Notice dated 12/14/20 (Document # 285) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to MARGOT CAMPBELL for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (rf, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 288 TPO Form re #280 Notice of Appeal : (DICKINSON, CHARLES)
December 15, 2020 Filing 287 MOTION to Seal Confidential Information filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D, #5 Exhibit Attachment E, #6 Exhibit Attachment F, #7 Exhibit Attachment G)(GEORGE, ANDREW)
December 15, 2020 DOC. NO. 285 HAS BEEN MAILED TO COUNSEL, HUGHES; RANCOUR; OLIVER; LEIBENLUFT; COMMINS, JR. AND CAMPBELL. (bw, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 286 MOTION to Seal Exhibits and Other Documents filed by AETNA, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Document Chart, #2 Attachment B - Aetna Sept. 8, 2020 Motion)(ROMEO, JUSTIN)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDERED THAT CONSISTENT WITH THE PARTIES AGREEMENT, THE FEBRUARY 28, 2020 TRO (ECF 11) IS AMENDED TO BAR CONSUMMATION OF THE DEFENDANTS MERGER UNTIL 11:59 P.M. ON MONDAY, DECEMBER 21, 2020; AND THE GOVERNMENTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL (ECF 279), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/14/20.12/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
December 12, 2020 Filing 284 NOTICE by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY [Defendants' Letter Regarding FTC's Emergency Motion for an Injunction Pending Appeal] (SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL)
December 11, 2020 Filing 282 RESPONSE in Opposition re #279 MOTION to Stay PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. (BOWERMAN, ALEXANDER)
December 10, 2020 Filing 283 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #280 Notice of Appeal filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. USCA Case Number 20-3499 (jaa, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 281 IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR AN EMERGENCY INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL (ECF NO. 279) BY 12:00 PM ON FRIDAY, DECEMBER 11.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/10/20. 12/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kf, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 280 NOTICE OF APPEAL by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. No filing fee required. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. Certificate of Service. (SEIDMAN, MARK) Modified on 12/11/2020 (lisad, ).
December 9, 2020 Filing 279 MOTION to Stay PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SEIDMAN, MARK)
December 8, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRIES #276, 277 AND 278 TO COUNSEL ON 12/8/20. (jaa, )
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER THAT THE COMPLAINT OF THE FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION AND THE COMMONEWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA SEEKING A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY AND ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK PURSUANT TO SECTION 13 (b) OF THE FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION ACT, 15 U.S.C.& 53 (b) AND SECTION 16 OF THE CLAYTON ACT IS DISMISSED CONSISTENT WITH THE ACCOMPAYING MEMORANDUM OPINION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/8/20. 12/8/20 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(JL )
December 8, 2020 Filing 277 MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/8/20. 12/8/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL )
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER THAT THE EXHIBITS LISTED IN EXHIBITS A AND B TO ECF 274 AND IN APPENDIX A TO ECF 275 ARE ADMITTED. THAT THE MOTIONS AT ECF 129,130,173,218,257,265 AND 267 ARE DENIED. THE MOTION AT ECF 163 IS GRANTED AND DENIED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/8/20. 12/8/20 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(JL )
December 7, 2020 Filing 275 Letter dated 10/12/20 by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY (jaa, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 274 Letter dated 10/12/20 by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (jaa, )
October 29, 2020 Copy of Order/Notice dated 9/21/2020 (Document # 249) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to GREGORY J. COMMINS, JR. for the following reason: RTS, ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN, UNABLE TO FORWARD.. (sg, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 273 Transcript of Closing Arguments held on 10/26/20, before Judge GERALD J. PAPPERT. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. (jaa, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 272 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Evidentiary Hearing held on 10/26/20. Court Reporter: ESR. (JL)
October 20, 2020 Doc. 271 Mailed to Attorneys. (er, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 STIPULATION AND ORDER ON RESOLUTION OF #255 MOTION OF INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS TO PRECLUDE THE ADMISSION OF CONFIDENTIAL BUSINESS RECORDS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/15/20.10/16/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (fdc)
October 14, 2020 Filing 270 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. (ROACH, JOHN)
October 13, 2020 Filing 269 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Filed Under Seal by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(tjd) (tjd, ).
October 13, 2020 Filing 268 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Filed Under Seal by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd) (tjd, ).
October 12, 2020 Filing 267 MOTION to Seal Document DEFENDANTS PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY..(ROACH, JOHN)
October 12, 2020 Filing 266 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Certificate of Service (SEIDMAN, MARK)
October 12, 2020 Filing 265 MOTION to Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WEINGARTEN, JAMES)
October 7, 2020 Filing 264 Copies of Orders dated 9/10/20, 9/11/20 (Document #s 217,222,223,224,229,230,233,235,236,237,238) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Gregory J. Commins, Jr. for the following reason: Return to Sender - No Such Number - Unable to Fwd.. (fdc, )
October 7, 2020 PLEADING #249 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL )
October 7, 2020 Filing 263 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Day 6 held on 10/1/20 before Judge GERALD J. PAPPERT. Court Reporter: BURKE. (jaa, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 262 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Day 5 held on 9/30/20 before Judge GERALD J. PAPPERT. Court Reporter: BURKE. (jaa, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Day 4 held on 9/29/20 before Judge GERALD J. PAPPERT. Court Reporter: BURKE. (jaa, )
October 5, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #260 TO COUNSEL ON 10/5/20. (jaa, )
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT THEIR PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW BY MONDAY, OCTOBER 12. EACH SIDES SUBMISSION SHALL BE LIMITED TO FIFTY (50) PAGES AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW SHALL BE HELD ON MONDAY, OCTOBER 26, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M., IN COURTROOM 13-B. MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AND MEDIA WHO WISH TO LISTEN TO THE HEARING SHOULD USE THE FOLLOWING CALL IN INFORMATION: PHONE NUMBER: 888-398-2342; ACCESS CODE: 4373141#. RECORDING AND BROADCASTING OF COURT PROCEEDINGS IS PROHIBITED (LOCAL RULE 83.3). SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/1/20. 10/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 259 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Day 6 Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 10/1/20. Court Reporter: ESR. (jaa, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 256 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Day 5 Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/30/20. Court Reporter: ESR. (jaa, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 258 EXHIBITS Filed Under Seal by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd) (tjd, ).
September 30, 2020 Filing 257 MOTION TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL FILED BY INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS.(tjd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 255 MOTION to Preclude Admission of Confidential Business Records filed by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LIMBURG, RICHARD)
September 29, 2020 Filing 254 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Day 4 Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/29/20. Court Reporter: ESR. (jaa, )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER: THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING IS SCHEDULED TO CONTINUE IN THIS CASE ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2020 AT 8:30 A.M. THE PROCEEDINGS ARE EXPECTED TO END AT 5:00 P.M. EACH DAY, WITH TIME PROVIDED FOR BREAKS. MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AND MEDIA WHO WISH TO LISTEN TO THE HEARING SHOULD USE THE FOLLOWING CALL IN INFORMATION: PHONE NUMBER: 571-353-2300; ACCESS CODE: 020095070#. RECORDING AND BROADCASTING OF COURT PROCEEDINGS IS PROHIBITED (LOCAL RULE 83.3).. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/24/20. 9/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kf, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 252 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Day 3 held on 9/16/20 before Judge GERALD J. PAPPERT. Court Reporter: BURKE. (jaa, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 251 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Day 2 held on 9/15/20 before Judge GERALD J. PAPPERT. Court Reporter: BURKE. (jaa, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 250 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Day 1 held on 9/14/20 before Judge GERALD J. PAPPERT. Court Reporter: BURKE. (jaa, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER THAT NON-PARTY GENESIS HEALTHCARE MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC ADMISSION OF JONATHAN M. GROSSMAN IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/21/20. 9/22/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL) MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 9/22/2020. Modified on 9/22/2020 (kp, ).
September 18, 2020 Filing 248 NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING SET FOR 9/29/2020 08:30 AM IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT.(jelu, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 247 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Arugment via Teleconference held on 9/2/20 before Judge Gerald J. Pappert. Court Reporter: Burke. (jaa, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 246 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/16/20. Court Reporter: ESR. (jaa, )
September 17, 2020 PLEADING #244 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL )
September 17, 2020 Filing 245 NOTICE of Hearing: EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR 9/17/2020 AND 9/18/2020 08:30 AM HAS BEEN POSTPONED IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT.(jelu, )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDERED THAT NON-PARTY PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.S RENEWED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (ECF 234) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/16/20.9/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 16, 2020 Copies of Order #243 mailed to Counsel. (fdc)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDERED THAT NON-PARTY CIGNA CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF 231) OF THE COURTS SEPTEMBER 11, 2020 ORDER (ECF 230) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/15/20.9/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 242 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Day 2 Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/15/20. (jaa, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 241 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Day 1 Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/14/20. (jaa, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 240 RESPONSE in Opposition re #234 MOTION to Seal Document Non-Party Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
September 14, 2020 Filing 239 RESPONSE in Opposition re #207 MOTION for Contempt filed by PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (HITTINGER, CARL)
September 14, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRIES #217 #222 #223 #224 #229 #230 #233 #235 #236 #237 #238 TO COUNSEL ON 9/14/20. (jaa, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 234 MOTION to Seal Document Non-Party Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HITTINGER, CARL)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITYS MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS (ECF #168 ) AND DEFENDANT ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORKS MOTION TO SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL AND CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS. (ECF #186 .) IN DECIDING THE MOTIONS, THE COURT INCORPORATES THE BACKGROUND AND LEGAL STANDARDS FROM ITS MEMORANDUM RULING ON THE THIRD-PARTY MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ECF #229 .) THE COURT MAKES ITS DETERMINATIONS AFTER A CAREFUL DOCUMENT-BY-DOCUMENT REVIEW AND BASED ON THE LIMITED REASONS DEFENDANTS PROVIDED FOR KEEPING THE MATERIALS UNDER SEAL. THE MOTIONS (ECF #168 AND #186 ) ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 09/14/2020. 09/14/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
September 13, 2020 Filing 231 MOTION for Reconsideration re #230 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion),, filed by CIGNA CORPORATION.Memoradum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(BURKE, ROBERT)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF GREGORY J. COMMINS, JR. TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC AND CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/11/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL ALONG WITH ECF FORMS. (JL)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ALYSE F. STACH TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC AND CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/11/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (JL)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW M. GROSSMAN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC AND CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/11/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL(JL )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RANI A. HABASH IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/11/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(JL )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL HOWLEY AND MARGOT CAMPBELL TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/11/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(JL )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS ARE DENIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH AND FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM: ECF No. 138, 170, 175, 181 AND 228. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, CONSISTENT WITH THE PARTIES' JOINT LETTER OF SEPTEMBER 9(ECF 225) IDENTIFYING THE THIRD-PARTY DOCUMENTS THEY REASONABLY ANTICIPATE USING AT THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING, THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS ARE DENIED AS MOOT: ECF 137, 139, 140, 141, 142, 143, 145, 148, 149, 150, 151, 152, 154, 155, 156, 160, 161, 162, 165, 167, 169, 170, 171, 172, 174, 175, 176, 177, 178, 179, 181, 182, 184, 193, and 194.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/11/2020. 9/11/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL).(afm, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 229 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/11/2020. 9/11/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL)(afm, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 228 MOTION to Amend/Correct #181 MOTION to Seal filed by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS.Letter to Court correcting Motion to Limit Disclosure.(LIMBURG, RICHARD)
September 11, 2020 Filing 226 LETTER TO JUDGE PAPPERT; FROM PAUL H. SAINT-ANTOINE; DATED 9/10/20. (amas, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 225 LETTER TO JUDGE PAPPERT; FROM MARK SEIDMAN, TRACY WERTZ, PAUL SAINT-ANTOINE AND VIRGINIA GIBSON; DATED 9/9/20 (amas, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY AND ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. LOREN K. SMITH IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/11/20.9/11/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. NO. #132 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/10/20.9/11/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY AND ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF CHRISTINE HAMMER (DOC. NO. #127 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/10/20.9/11/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER: THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING IS SCHEDULED TO BEGIN ON SEPTEMBER 14, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M. THE PROCEEDINGS ARE EXPECTED TO END AT 5:00 P.M. EACH DAY, WITH TIME PROVIDED FOR BREAKS. MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AND MEDIA WHO WISH TO LISTEN TO THE HEARING SHOULD USE THE FOLLOWING CALL IN INFORMATION: PHONE NUMBER: 571-353-2300; ACCESS CODE: 020095070#. RECORDING AND BROADCASTING OF COURT PROCEEDINGS IS PROHIBITED (LOCAL RULE 83.3).. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/10/20. 9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kf, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 220 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan M. Grossman ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14556133.) filed by GENESIS HEALTHCARE.with Declaration, Certificate of Counsel, and Certificate of Service.(KAPLAN, MAX)
September 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #207 MOTION for Contempt . RESPONSES DUE BY 9/14/2020. (jaa, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDERED THAT NON-PARTY PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS ORDER DENYING ITS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND GRANTING DEFENDANT ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORKS COUNTER-MOTION TO COMPEL (DKT. NO. 191) IS DENIED1 AND PROSPECT SHALL PRODUCE THE FOLLOWING MATERIALS TO EINSTEIN ON OR BEFORE FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 11, 2020 AT 12:00 P.M. AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/10/20.9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 216 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/10/20 (jaa, )
September 10, 2020 DOCS # 209-214 MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 9/10/20 (rf, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 215 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC..Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Alyse F. Stach, #2 Declaration Gregory J. Commins, Jr., #3 Declaration Andrew M. Grossman, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Alyse F. Stach, #5 Text of Proposed Order for Gregory J. Commins, Jr., #6 Text of Proposed Order for Andrew M. Grossman)(HITTINGER, CARL)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT MARK J. BOTTI IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF UNITEDHEALTH GROUP. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/10/20.9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ANTHONY S. FERRARA IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF MAIN LINE HEALTH. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/10/20.9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT MICHELLE LOWERY IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF MAIN LINE HEALTH.SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/10/20.9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT IAIN R. MCPHIE IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF UNITEDHEALTH GROUP. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/10/20.9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT STEPHEN Y. WU IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF MAIN LINE HEALTH.SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/10/20.9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDERED THAT MOVANTS CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM AND PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDING INC.'S APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE (ECF NOS. 187-190), THE APPLICATIONS ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/10/20. 9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 207 MOTION for Contempt filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. **(UNTERMINATED PER CHAMBERS)**(Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration and In Support of Motion for Civil Contempt, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order Finding of Civil Contempt, #4 Certificate of Service)(GIBSON, VIRGINIA) Modified on 12/30/2020 (tjd).
September 9, 2020 Filing 227 EXHIBITS Filed Under Seal Re: #169 Motion for Leave filed by MAIN LINE HEALTH. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2020: #1 sealed document, #2 sealed document, #3 sealed document, #4 sealed document, #5 sealed document) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2020: #6 sealed document, #7 sealed document, #8 sealed document, #9 sealed document, #10 sealed document, #11 sealed document, #12 sealed document, #13 sealed document) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2020: #14 sealed document, #15 sealed document, #16 sealed document, #17 sealed document) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2020: #18 sealed document, #19 sealed document, #20 sealed document) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2020: #21 sealed document, #22 sealed document, #23 sealed document, #24 sealed document, #25 sealed document, #26 sealed document, #27 sealed document, #28 sealed document, #29 sealed document, #30 sealed document, #31 sealed document) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2020: #32 sealed documents, #33 sealed documents) (tjd, ).
September 9, 2020 Filing 219 EXHIBITS by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (afm, ) (afm, ).
September 9, 2020 Filing 218 MOTION OF INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS.(rf, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 208 Expert Reports and Expert Transcripts Filed Under Seal filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #1 sealed documents, #2 sealed documents, #3 sealed documents, #4 sealed documents, #5 sealed documents) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #6 sealed documents, #7 sealed documents, #8 sealed documents, #9 sealed documents, #10 sealed documents, #11 sealed documents, #12 sealed documents, #13 sealed documents) (tjd, ).
September 9, 2020 Filing 206 NOTICE by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK and Thomas Jefferson University Intent to Provide Testimony via Remote Contemporaneous Transmission (GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
September 9, 2020 Filing 205 NOTICE by CIGNA CORPORATION of Intent to Appear Remotely via Contemporaneous Transmission (BURKE, ROBERT)
September 9, 2020 Filing 204 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by CIGNA CORPORATION.Affidavit, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BURKE, ROBERT)
September 9, 2020 PLEADING #196 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL )
September 9, 2020 Filing 203 NOTICE by AETNA, INC. of Intent to Provide Testimony via Remote Contemporaneous Transmission Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 43(a) (ROMEO, JUSTIN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 202 NOTICE by SHANNONDELL, INC. nonparty of Intent to Provide Testimony Via Remote Contemporaneous Transmission Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 43(a) (MCCALL, BRIAN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 201 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Rani A. Habash filed by AETNA, INC..Declaration, Certificate of Service.(ROMEO, JUSTIN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 200 NOTICE by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP of Intent to Provide Testimony Via Remote Contemporaneous Transmission Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 43(a)
September 9, 2020 Filing 199 EXHIBIT s To Motion for Protective Order (Docket Number 179) by DOYLESTOWN HOSPITAL.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(SICALIDES, BARBARA)
September 9, 2020 Filing 198 NOTICE by ST. MARY REHABILITATION HOSPITAL of Intent to Provide Testimony Via Remote Contemporaneous Transmission Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 43(a) (SOUTHALL, SAMANTHA)
September 9, 2020 Filing 197 NOTICE by TOWER HEALTH of Intent to Provide Testimony via Remote Contemporaneous Transmission Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 43(a) (PENNINGTON, NICHOLAS)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/8/20. 9/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 195 RESPONSE to Motion re #128 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Loren K. Smith Related to Inpatient Rehabilitation Services filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (FRANCE, JAMIE)
September 8, 2020 Filing 194 MOTION to Seal Document #136 Order filed by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC..Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(HITTINGER, CARL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 193 MOTION to Seal Document #136 Order filed by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC..Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I)(HITTINGER, CARL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 192 Memorandum of Law in Support re #186 MOTION to Seal Highly Confidential and Confidential Documents filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LONEY, STEPHEN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 191 MOTION for Reconsideration re #126 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,, filed by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC..Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(HITTINGER, CARL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 190 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alyse F. Stach by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14549915.). (HITTINGER, CARL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 189 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Michael Grossman by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14549913.). (HITTINGER, CARL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 188 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory J. Commins, Jr. by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14549910.). (HITTINGER, CARL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 187 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory J. Commins, Jr. by CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC... (HITTINGER, CARL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 186 MOTION to Seal Highly Confidential and Confidential Documents filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LONEY, STEPHEN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 185 RESPONSE to Motion re #127 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Christine Hammer filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Declaration of Ryan T. Andrews)(ANDREWS, RYAN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 184 Concurred Motion to Seal Proposed Exhibits filed by AristaCare Health Services. Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(SANDERS, PAULA) Modified on 9/9/2020 (tjd).
September 8, 2020 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by PAULA G. SANDERS on behalf of AristaCare Health Services with Certificate of Service(SANDERS, PAULA)
September 8, 2020 Filing 182 MOTION to Seal Document Concurred Motion to Seal Proposed Exhibits filed by AristaCare Health Services.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Concurrence, Certificate of Service.**(FILED IN ERROR, INCOMPLETE PDF, ATTY REFILED, SEE DOCUMENT #184 FOR CORRECT FILING)**(SANDERS, PAULA) Modified on 9/9/2020 (tjd).
September 8, 2020 Filing 181 MOTION to Seal filed by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LIMBURG, RICHARD)
September 8, 2020 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW on behalf of DOYLESTOWN HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(ZASTROW, DENNIE)
September 8, 2020 Filing 179 MOTION for Protective Order filed by DOYLESTOWN HOSPITAL. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support, #2 Plan of Finance Redacted, #3 Redacted 1.5.18 Presentation, #4 Brexler Redacted Transcript)(SICALIDES, BARBARA)
September 8, 2020 Filing 178 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit with Bates Nunbers "UPHS 004301-004318" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 177 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit with Bates Numbers "UPHS 004286-004300" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 176 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Pre-Hearing Memorandum filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(GEORGE, ANDREW)
September 8, 2020 Filing 175 MOTION for Protective Order filed by CIGNA CORPORATION.Motion to Protect Sensitive Business Information. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(BURKE, ROBERT)
September 8, 2020 Filing 174 MOTION to Seal filed by PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3-7)(HERROLD, TYSON)
September 8, 2020 Filing 173 EXHIBIT Joint Motion to Seal Expert Reports and Depo Transcripts by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(WOOD, ABIGAIL) (Main Document 173 replaced on 9/9/2020 with Permission from Chambers) (tjd, ). Modified on 9/9/2020 (tjd).
September 8, 2020 Filing 172 MOTION to Seal Document MOTION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF THIRD PARTY, HEALTH PARTNERS PLANS, INC., TO SEAL PORTIONS OF EXHIBIT PX7011, HEALTH PARTNERS PLANS TRANSCRIPT filed by HEALTH PARTNERS PLANS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Compliance, #4 Certificate of Service)(SUTHERLAND, SHANNON)
September 8, 2020 Filing 171 MOTION to Seal Hearing Exhibits filed by AETNA, INC..Certificate of Service, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - Chart of Exhibits, #2 Declaration Attachment B - Morris Declaration, #3 Exhibit Attachment C Part 1 - Redacted Exhibits 1 through 14, #4 Exhibit Attachment C Part 2 - Redacted Exhibits 15 through 20)(ROMEO, JUSTIN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 170 MOTION to Seal and for Protective Order filed by GENESIS HEALTHCARE.with Certificates of Counsel and Serivce. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit B (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit C (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit D (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit E (Redacted), #7 Exhibit F (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit G (Redacted))(KAPLAN, MAX)
September 8, 2020 Filing 169 MOTION to Seal Hearing Exhibits That Contain Confidential and Highly-Confidential Information filed by MAIN LINE HEALTH.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Description of Documents Filed Under Seal and Proposed Redactions, #2 Declaration of Shaune Ferrara, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(THOMPSON, PAUL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 168 MOTION to Seal Document #163 MOTION to Seal Document DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITYS MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.Memorandum, Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Appendix A)(ROACH, JOHN) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/9/2020 per Chambers) (tjd). Modified on 9/9/2020 (tjd).
September 8, 2020 Filing 167 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit with Bates Numbers "UPHS 004208-004219" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 166 RESPONSE to Motion re #132 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM OFFERING THIRD-PARTY DECLARATIONS AND INVESTIGATIONAL HEARING TESTIMONY AS EVIDENCE filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Declaration Of James H. Weingarten)(WEINGARTEN, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 165 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit with Bates Number "UPHS 004002" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by MAX E. KAPLAN on behalf of GENESIS HEALTHCARE with Certificate of Service(KAPLAN, MAX)
September 8, 2020 Filing 163 MOTION to Seal Document DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITYS MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(ROACH, JOHN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 162 MOTION to Seal Proposed Exhibits filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order, Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T)(DORAN, PATRICK)
September 8, 2020 Filing 161 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Anthony S. Ferrara ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14549596.) filed by MAIN LINE HEALTH.Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(THOMPSON, PAUL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 160 MOTION for Protective Order filed by SHANNONDELL, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCCALL, BRIAN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 159 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michelle Lowery ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14549567.) filed by MAIN LINE HEALTH.Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(THOMPSON, PAUL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. BURKE on behalf of CIGNA CORPORATION with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance)(BURKE, ROBERT)
September 8, 2020 Filing 157 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Y. Wu ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14549485.) filed by MAIN LINE HEALTH.Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(THOMPSON, PAUL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 156 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit with Bates Numbers "UPHS 003918-003938" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificare of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 155 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit with Bates Numbers "UPHS 003193-003231" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 154 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit with Bates Numbers "UPHS 002883-002940" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL M. THOMPSON on behalf of MAIN LINE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(THOMPSON, PAUL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 152 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit with Bates Numbers "PENN 1804-1814" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 151 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit 1813 with Bates Numbers "FTC-PENN 1797-1824" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 150 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Iain R. McPhie filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP..(GEORGE, ANDREW)
September 8, 2020 Filing 149 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Mark J. Botti filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP..(GEORGE, ANDREW)
September 8, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit 1809 with Bates Numbers "PENN 003676-003707" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW GEORGE on behalf of UNITEDHEALTH GROUP (GEORGE, ANDREW)
September 8, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK H. GRIFFIN, IV on behalf of DOYLESTOWN HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service(GRIFFIN, FRANK)
September 8, 2020 Filing 145 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit 1804 with Bates Nunbers "UPHS 003890-003917" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by BARBARA T. SICALIDES on behalf of DOYLESTOWN HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service(SICALIDES, BARBARA)
September 8, 2020 Filing 143 MOTION for Protective Order to Protect Use of Proposed Exhibits Containing Sensitive Business Information filed by TOWER HEALTH.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(PENNINGTON, NICHOLAS)
September 8, 2020 Filing 142 MOTION to Seal Document Identified as Defendants' Trial Exhibit 1803 with Bates Numbers "UPHS 003111-003123" filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 141 MOTION to Seal Document filed by SABER HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC, Elkins Crest Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(MUNDY, WILLIAM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 140 MOTION to Seal Document filed by TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(YOUNG, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 139 MOTION to Seal filed by Tandigm Health, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(LIMBURG, RICHARD)
September 8, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #136 TO COUNSEL ON 9/8/20. (jaa, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION to Seal Document {{to seal Propposed Trial Exhibits}} filed by ST. MARY REHABILITATION HOSPITAL.Memorandum, Certficate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(SOUTHALL, SAMANTHA)
September 8, 2020 Filing 137 MOTION to Protect Sensitive Business and Protected Health Information filed by Kessler Institute for Rehabilitation.Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Compliance)(TROY, PAUL)
September 4, 2020 Filing 136 FINAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/4/20. 9/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 135 EXHIBITS Filed Under Seal to #132 MOTION IN LIMINE by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd) (tjd, ).
September 2, 2020 Filing 134 Pre-Hearing Memorandum Filed Under Seal by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2020: #1 sealed document, #2 sealed document, #3 sealed document, #4 sealed document, #5 sealed document, #6 sealed document, #7 sealed document, #8 sealed document, #9 sealed document, #10 sealed document, #11 sealed document, #12 sealed document, #13 sealed document, #14 sealed document, #15 sealed document, #16 sealed document, #17 sealed document, #18 sealed document, #19 sealed document, #20 sealed document, #21 sealed documents, #22 sealed document, #23 sealed document, #24 sealed document, #25 sealed document, #26 sealed document, #27 sealed document, #28 sealed document, #29 sealed document) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2020: #30 sealed document) (tjd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2020: #31 sealed document, #32 sealed document) (tjd, ).
September 2, 2020 Filing 133 DEFENDANTS' PREHEARING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. (ROACH, JOHN)
September 2, 2020 Filing 132 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM OFFERING THIRD-PARTY DECLARATIONS AND INVESTIGATIONAL HEARING TESTIMONY AS EVIDENCE filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10 filed under seal)(ROACH, JOHN)
September 2, 2020 Filing 131 PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Certificate of Service. (WEINGARTEN, JAMES) Modified on 9/9/2020 (tjd).
September 2, 2020 Filing 130 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits to Defendants' Motion in Limine filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(ROACH, JOHN)
September 2, 2020 Filing 129 MOTION to Seal Document MOTION TO FILE PLAINTIFFS PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM AND DOCUMENTS REFERENCED THEREIN TEMPORARILY UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WEINGARTEN, JAMES)
September 2, 2020 Filing 128 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Loren K. Smith Related to Inpatient Rehabilitation Services filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Loren K. Smith Related to Inpatient Rehabilitation Services, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Justin W. Bernick, #4 Exhibit 1 - Transcript Excerpts, #5 Certificate of Service)(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
September 2, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Christine Hammer filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Their Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christine Hammer, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Justin W. Bernick, #4 Exhibit 1 - Transcript Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 2 - draft Joint Stipulation, #6 Certificate of Service)(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
September 2, 2020 PLEADING #124 AND #126 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDERED THAT PROSPECTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SANCTIONS (DKT. NO. 120) IS DENIED; ANDEINSTEINS COUNTER-MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION (DKT. NOS 119 AND 123) IS GRANTED AND PROSPECT SHALL PRODUCE THE FOLLOWING MATERIALS TO EINSTEIN ON OR BEFORE TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 8, 2020: REQUEST NO. 4 PROSPECTS 2017, 2018, AND 2019 CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL STATEMENTS; REQUEST NO. 8 DOCUMENTS SUFFICIENT TO SHOW ANY EXPANSION OR REDUCTION IN SERVICES AT PROSPECTS FACILITIES. THIS INCLUDES, BUT IS NOT LIMITED TO, EXPANSION THAT WOULD ATTRACT PATIENTS FROM THE PHILADELPHIA AREA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/1/20.9/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 125 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Motion Hearing held on 9/1/20 Court Reporter: ESR. (jaa, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDERED THAT MOTION HEARING SET FOR 9/1/2020 02:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 8/28/20. 8/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions and In Support of Counter-Motion to Compel Production and COUNTER-MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Virginia Gibson, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #5 Exhibit B - Letter, #6 Exhibit C - Opposition to Subpoena, #7 Exhibit D - Letter, #8 Exhibit E - Letter, #9 Exhibit F - Articles, #10 Exhibit G - Email, #11 Exhibit H - Deposition Transcript, #12 Exhibit I - Email, #13 Exhibit J - Email, #14 Exhibit K - Declaration, #15 Exhibit L - Letter, #16 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion for PO, #17 Text of Proposed Order Granting Counter-Motion to Compel, #18 Certificate of Service)(GIBSON, VIRGINIA) Modified on 8/24/2020 (tjd).
August 21, 2020 Filing 122 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Telephone Conference held on 8/21/20 (jaa, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re #119 MOTION to Compel and in Further Support of its Motion for a Protective Order and Sanctions filed by PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (HITTINGER, CARL)
August 18, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions filed by PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Declaration.(HITTINGER, CARL)
August 17, 2020 DOCS. 114, 115, 117, AND 118 MAILED TO ATTORNEYS WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS. (sg, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORKS MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (ECF NO. 116), THE MOTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 8/14/20.8/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDERED THAT PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (ECF NO. 113), THE MOTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 8/14/20.8/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 119 Response Filed Under Seal in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions and Counter-Motion to Compel Production. Memorandum, Declaration, Exhibits filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(tjd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #1 sealed document) (tjd, ).
August 11, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY THE SUBPOENA IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/29/20. 7/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/29/20. 7/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC..Certificate of Service.(HITTINGER, CARL)
July 24, 2020 Filing 112 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Quash Defendants' Subpoena by Kindred Healthcare, LLC, filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY and ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration of Howard Bruce Klein)(KLEIN, HOWARD) Modified on 7/27/2020 (tjd).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Orders 54, 55, 61, 66, and 77 mailed to Counsel. (fdc)
July 22, 2020 DOC. NOS. 99 AND 102 MAILED TO ATTY PALLMAN (WITH ECF REGISTRATION FORMS). (md, )
July 22, 2020 DOC. NOS. 54, 55, 61, 63, 66, 77, 99 AND 102 MAILED TO ATTORNEYS HUGHES, LEIBENLUFT, OLIVER and RANCOUR. (md, )
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDERED THAT PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.5.2(B) OF THE UNITED STATED DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, ERIC H. JASO AND THOMAS M. KENNY ARE HEREBY ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE IN THE ABOVE MATTER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/17/20.7/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *ORDER WILL BE MAILED BY CHAMBERS.(jaa, )
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT VICTORIA A. JOSEPH IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PROHAC VICE ON BEHALF OF ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/17/20.7/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *ORDER WILL BE MAILED BY CHAMBERS.(jaa, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Victoria A. Joseph ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14424655.) filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Proposed Order, Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
July 14, 2020 Filing 108 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Eric H. Jaso and Thomas M. Kenny ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14418619.) filed by Kindred Healthcare, LLC.Affidavit, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason C. Spiro, #2 Affidavit of Eric H. Jaso, #3 Affidavit of Thomas M. Kenny, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SPIRO, JASON)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDERED THAT, FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE JULY 8, 2020 LETTER SUBMITTED BY EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK ("EINSTEIN") AND THOSE DISCUSSED DURING THE TELECONFERENCE HELD BY THE COURT ON JULY 9, 2020, THIRD PARTIES DRESHER HILL HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER AND ELKINS CREST HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER (TOGETHER, "SABER") SHALL FULLY COMPLY WITH THE SUBPOENA SERVED UPON SABER IN THIS ACTION ON OR ABOUT APRIL 1, 2020, BY PRODUCING DOCUMENTS AND DATA RESPONSIVE TO THE NINETEEN REQUESTS SET FORTH IN THE SUBPOENA BY MONDAY, JULY 20, 2020.SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/13/20. 7/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *ORDER MAILED BY CHAMBERS. (jaa, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 106 MOTION to Quash Defendants' Subpoena filed by Kindred Healthcare, LLC.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Quash, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Declaration of Matthew B. Steinberg, #6 Certificate of Service)(SPIRO, JASON)
July 9, 2020 Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Telephone Conference held on 7/9/20 (jaa, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by KENDYL GILMORE on behalf of ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK with Certificate of Service(GILMORE, KENDYL)
July 8, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by CARL W. HITTINGER on behalf of CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC. with Certificate of Service(HITTINGER, CARL)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER THAT TANDIGM HEALTH LLC'S #78 MOTION TO QUASH IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/7/20.7/7/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (fdc)
July 7, 2020 Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT. A Telephone Conference was held on 7/7/20. (fdc)
July 2, 2020 Filing 100 STIPULATED AND ORDERED THAT AGREED BY JEFFERSON AND TANDIGM, THROUGH THEIRUNDERSIGNED COUNSEL, THAT THE DEADLINE FOR JEFFERSON TO RESPOND TO TANDIGMS MOTION TO QUASH IS FURTHER EXTENDED FROM WEDNESDAY, JULY 1, 2020 TO AND INCLUDING TUESDAY, JULY 7, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/2/20. 7/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *CHAMBERS WILL MAIL OUT ORDER.(jaa, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/2/20.7/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Telephone Conference held on 7/1/2020 (sg, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 97 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Telephone Conference held on 6/30/20 (JL )
June 30, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROL FRANCES TREVEY on behalf of THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(TREVEY, CAROL)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND AMONG COUNSEL FOR THE FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION("FTC"), THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK ("EINSTEIN"), AND NON-PARTY SHANNONDELL AT VALLEY FORGE ("SHANNONDELL") THAT THE DATE FOR RESPONSE BY SHANNONDELL TO THE SEPARATE SUBPOENAS SERVED UPON IT BY THE FTC AND EINSTEIN IS EXTENDED FROM FRIDAY, JUNE 26, 2020 TO AND INCLUDING FRIDAY, JULY 3, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/29/20. 6/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *CHAMBERS MAIL OUT ORDER TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT MOLLY PALLMAN IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/29/20.6/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *CHAMBERS WILL OUT ORDER TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14382926.) filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Proposed Order, Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
June 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #78 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas. RESPONSES DUE BY 7/1/2020. (jaa, ) Modified on 6/30/2020 (jaa, ).
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDERED THAT BY JEFFERSON AND TANDIGM, THROUGH THEIRUNDERSIGNED COUNSEL, THAT THE DEADLINE FOR JEFFERSON TO RESPOND TO TANDIGM'S MOTION TO QUASH IS FURTHER EXTENDED FROM WEDNESDAY, JUNE 24, 2020 TO AND INCLUDING WEDNESDAY, JULY 1, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/25/20. 6/26/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *CHAMBERS MAIL OUT ORDER TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNINGTHE TAKING OF REMOTE DEPOSITIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/22/20. 6/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *CHAMBERS WILL MAIL OUT ORDER.(jaa, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER BY JEFFERSON AND TANDIGM, THROUGH THEIR UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL, THAT THE DEADLINE FOR JEFFERSON TO RESPOND TO TANDIGM' S MOTION TO QUASH IS EXTENDED FROM FRIDAY, JUNE 19, 2020 TO AND INCLUDING WEDNESDAY, JUNE 24, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/18/20. 6/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *CHAMBERS WILL MAIL OUT ORDER TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT STEPHEN M. SCANNELL IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURTPRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/18/20.6/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *CHAMBERS WILL MAIL OUT ORDER.(jaa, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Stephen M. Scannell filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Declaration, Certificate of Service.(WOOD, ABIGAIL)
June 16, 2020 Filing 87 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #75 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Independence Blue Cross filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(ROACH, JOHN)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION IS DENIED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/16/20.6/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *ORDER WILL BE MAILED BY CHAMBERS.(jaa, )
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION("FTC") AND ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK ("EINSTEIN") AND NON-PARTY TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA (TRUSTEES) THAT THE DATE FOR RESPONSE BY TRUSTEES TO THE SEPARATE SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SERVED UPON IT BY THE FTC AND EINSTEIN IS EXTENDED FROM FRIDAY, JUNE 12, 2020 TO AND INCLUDING FRIDAY, JUNE 19, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/12/20. 6/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) *ORDER WILL BE MAILED BY CHAMBERS.
June 12, 2020 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Telephone Conference held on 6/12/20 (jaa, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 82 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Subpoenas for Production of Documents filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK. Stipulation to Extend Time.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**(GIBSON, VIRGINIA) Modified on 6/15/2020 (tjd).
June 9, 2020 Filing 85 APPLICATION FORM FOR STEPHEN M. SCANNELL SEEKING TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B). *FILING PAID 6/9/20. filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jaa, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDERED THAT NONPARTY TOWER HEALTHS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND NOTICE TO MAINTAIN HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION (ECF NO. 60), THE FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION AND COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIAS RESPONSE (ECF NO. 68), AND ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK AND THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITYS RESPONSE (ECF NO. 70) THAT THEMOTION IN DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/9/20.6/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *ORDERED WILL BE MAILED BY CHAMBERS. (jaa, ) Modified on 6/9/2020 (jaa, ).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SHANNONDELL SHALL COMPLY WITH THE NINETEEN REQUESTS IN THE SUBPOENAS, BUT THE COURT EXTENDS THE TIME FOR COMPLIANCE TO ON OR BEFORE FRIDAY, JUNE 26, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/5/20. 6/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *ORDER WILL BE MAILED TO COUNSEL BY CHAMBERS.(jaa, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/5/20. 6/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *ORDER WILL BE MAILED TO COUNSEL BY CHAMBERS. (jaa, ) Modified on 6/5/2020 (jaa, ).
June 5, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Tandigm Health, LLC.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Certificate of Service)(LIMBURG, RICHARD)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIAS APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE (ECF NO. 72), THAT THE APPLICATION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/5/20. 6/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD P. LIMBURG on behalf of Tandigm Health, LLC with Certificate of Service(LIMBURG, RICHARD)
June 4, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or Modify Document Subpoena and 30(B)(6) Deposition Subpoena filed by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order OR, #10 Certificate of Service)(LIMBURG, RICHARD) Modified on 6/5/2020 (tjd).
June 4, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD P. LIMBURG on behalf of INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS with Certificate of Service(LIMBURG, RICHARD)
June 3, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH STEPHEN BETSKO on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(BETSKO, JOSEPH)
June 3, 2020 Filing 72 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen M. Scannell by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.. (BETSKO, JOSEPH)
May 28, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES A. DONAHUE, III on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (DONAHUE, JAMES)
May 21, 2020 Filing 70 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #60 MOTION for Protective Order and Notice to Maintain Highly Confidential Designation filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. (ROACH, JOHN) Modified on 5/22/2020 (tjd).
May 21, 2020 Filing 69 Declaration re #67 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Shannondell's Motion to Quash by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK. (LONEY, STEPHEN)
May 21, 2020 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Motion re #60 MOTION for Protective Order and Notice to Maintain Highly Confidential Designation filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA and FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Proposed Order)(WOOD, ABIGAIL) Modified on 5/22/2020 (tjd).
May 21, 2020 Filing 67 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #56 Third Party MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK. (GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 5/18/20. 5/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD BRUCE KLEIN on behalf of ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(KLEIN, HOWARD)
May 14, 2020 Filing 64 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 Third Party MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(WEINGARTEN, JAMES)
May 14, 2020 Filing 63 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 5/14/20. 5/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 62 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDERED THAT TRUSTEES IS GRANTED SHALL HAVE TO AND INCLUDING FRIDAY, MAY 29, 2020 TO INFORM COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES OF THE DESIGNATED LEVEL OF CONFIDENTIALITY FOR THE DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY TRUSTEES PRIOR TO THE DATE OFTHIS COURT'S ORDER APPROVING THE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER OF THE PARTIES ENTERED IN THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 5/8/20. 5/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Protective Order and Notice to Maintain Highly Confidential Designation filed by TOWER HEALTH.Certificate of Service.(PENNINGTON, NICHOLAS)
May 7, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS H. PENNINGTON on behalf of TOWER HEALTH with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(PENNINGTON, NICHOLAS)
April 30, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. KOVATIS on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(KOVATIS, STEPHEN)
April 30, 2020 Filing 57 Memorandum re #56 Third Party MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by SHANNONDELL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MCCALL, BRIAN)
April 30, 2020 Filing 56 Third Party MOTION to Quash Subpoena and/or Modify the Subpoenas to Produce Documents filed by SHANNONDELL, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MCCALL, BRIAN) Modified on 5/1/2020 (tjd).
April 17, 2020 Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/17/20. 4/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS'. (jaa, ) Modified on 4/20/2020 (tjd).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/10/2020 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT. DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/28/2020. MOTIONS DUE BY 9/2/2020. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 9/2/2020. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 9/2/2020. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 9/2/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/17/20. 4/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) *NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS'.
March 19, 2020 Filing 53 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.(SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL)
March 19, 2020 Filing 52 ANSWER to #7 Complaint, by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.(SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL)
March 19, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to #7 Complaint, for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
March 19, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by GARIMA MALHOTRA on behalf of ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK (MALHOTRA, GARIMA)
March 18, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER B. BOWERMAN on behalf of ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK (BOWERMAN, ALEXANDER)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION OF VIRGINIA GIBSON, ESQUIRE FOR ADMISSION OF ROBERT F. LEIBENLUFT, ESQUIRE AND ANY RESPONSE THERETO IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/18/20.3/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION OF VIRGINIA GIBSON, ESQUIRE FOR ADMISSION OF KIMBERLY D. RANCOUR, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/18/20.3/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER D. HARRIS on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (HARRIS, CHRISTOPHER)
March 17, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMIE E. FRANCE on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (FRANCE, JAMIE)
March 17, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN T. ANDREWS on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (ANDREWS, RYAN)
March 17, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN R. WRIGHT on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (WRIGHT, JONATHAN)
March 17, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by GUSTAV PETER CHIARELLO, III on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (CHIARELLO, GUSTAV)
March 17, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by ALBERT TENG on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (TENG, ALBERT)
March 17, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by GUIA DIXON on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (DIXON, GUIA)
March 16, 2020 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Telephone Conference held on 3/16/2020 (md)
March 16, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Robert F. Leibenluft ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14181913.) filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDERED THAT THE ADMISSION OF LEHIGH L. OLIVER, ESQUIRE AND ANY RESPONSE THERE IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/16/20.3/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDERED THAT THE ADMISSION OF KATHLEEN K. HUGHES, ESQUIRE AND ANY RESPONSE THERETO IS GRANTNED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2 AND KATHLEEN K. HUGHES IS ADMITTED IN THESE PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/16/20.3/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION OF VIRGINIA GIBSON, ESQUIRE FOR ADMISSION OF JUSTIN W. BERNICK, ESQUIRE AND ANY RESPOSNE THERETO, IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2 AND JUSTIN W. BERNICK IS ADMITTED IN THESE PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/16/20.3/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR TODAY, MARCH 16, 2020 AT 2:15 PM BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CALL.(kf, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Kimberly D. Rancour ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14178971.) filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
March 13, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Leigh L. Oliver ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14178944.) filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
March 13, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen K. Hughes ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14178902.) filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
March 13, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Justin W. Bernick ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14178578.) filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Motion, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
March 13, 2020 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND RESPECTIVE PROPOSALS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (SEIDMAN, MARK)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED THAT ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER DENIED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO UNSEAL THE UNREDACTED COMPLAINT DOCKETED AT ECF NO. 7 ON MARCH 16, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/12/20.3/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 27 Consent MOTION to Seal Single Allegation in Complaint Permanently filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Stephen A. Loney, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Redacted Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LONEY, STEPHEN)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT JONAHTAN H. TODT IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/6/20.3/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT JOHN L. ROACH IV IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/6/20.3/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS GRANTED AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALISON M. AGNEW IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/6/20.3/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/E-MAILED.(jaa, ) Modified on 3/6/2020 (jaa, ).
March 5, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER A THOMSON on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (THOMSON, JENNIFER)
March 5, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jonathan H. Todt ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14158176.) filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(YI, JOHN)
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice John L. Roach IV ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14158146.) filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(YI, JOHN)
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Alison M. Agnew ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14158116.) filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.Proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(YI, JOHN)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, GRANTED AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DANIEL J. DELANEY IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/4/20.3/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BE AND HEREBY IS GRANTED AND IT IS FURTHER THAT KENNETH M. VORRASI IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/4/20.3/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN A. LONEY, JR on behalf of ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK (LONEY, STEPHEN)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by VIRGINIA A. GIBSON on behalf of ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK (GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Telephone Conference held on 2/28/20 (jaa, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Daniel J. Delaney ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14146037.) filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.Declaration, Certificate of Service.(YI, JOHN)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Kenneth M. Vorrasi ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14145989.) filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY.Declaration, Certificate of Service.(YI, JOHN)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT TEMPORARILY UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 2/28/20.2/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 2/28/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)2/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES H WEINGARTEN on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (WEINGARTEN, JAMES)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to Withdraw Unopposed Motion for Entry of Protective Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (SEIDMAN, MARK)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ABIGAIL U. WOOD on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (WOOD, ABIGAIL)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. YI on behalf of THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(YI, JOHN)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL H. SAINT-ANTOINE on behalf of THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(SAINT-ANTOINE, PAUL)
February 27, 2020 2 Summons Issued as to ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MARK SEIDMAN on 2/28/2020 (amas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2020: #1 Affidavit sealed document) (lvj, ).
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT TEMPORARILY UNDER SEAL, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(amas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(amas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, WITH AFFIDAVIT AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(amas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, against ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. (NO FEE REQUIRED) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al v. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: MARK D. SEIDMAN
Represented By: ABIGAIL U. WOOD
Represented By: TRACY W. WERTZ
Represented By: JENNIFER A THOMSON
Represented By: JAMES A. DONAHUE, III
Represented By: JOSEPH STEPHEN BETSKO
Represented By: STEPHEN M. SCANNELL
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: MARK D. SEIDMAN
Represented By: TRACY W. WERTZ
Represented By: JAMES H WEINGARTEN
Represented By: CHARLES E. DICKINSON
Represented By: GUIA DIXON
Represented By: JAMIE E. FRANCE
Represented By: ALBERT TENG
Represented By: GUSTAV PETER CHIARELLO, III
Represented By: RYAN T. ANDREWS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D. HARRIS
Represented By: JONATHAN R. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK
Represented By: KIMBERLY D. RANCOUR
Represented By: KATHLEEN K. HUGHES
Represented By: ALEXANDER B. BOWERMAN
Represented By: STEPHEN A. LONEY, JR.
Represented By: ROBERT F. LEIBENLUFT
Represented By: GARIMA MALHOTRA
Represented By: LEIGH L. OLIVER
Represented By: VIRGINIA A. GIBSON
Represented By: JUSTIN W. BERNICK
Represented By: HOWARD BRUCE KLEIN
Represented By: MOLLY PALLMAN
Represented By: KENDYL GILMORE
Represented By: VICTORIA A. JOSEPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: PAUL H. SAINT-ANTOINE
Represented By: JOHN S. YI
Represented By: DANIEL J. DELANEY
Represented By: JOHN L. ROACH, IV
Represented By: KENNETH M. VORRASI
Represented By: ALISON M. AGNEW
Represented By: JONATHAN H. TODT
Represented By: HOWARD BRUCE KLEIN
Represented By: CAROL FRANCES TREVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NON-PARTY Elkins Crest Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM J. MUNDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tandigm Health, LLC
Represented By: RICHARD P. LIMBURG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MAIN LINE HEALTH
Represented By: MICHELLE LOWERY
Represented By: ANTHONY S. FERRARA
Represented By: PAUL M. THOMPSON
Represented By: STEPHEN Y. WU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GENESIS HEALTHCARE
Represented By: JONATHAN M. GROSSMAN
Represented By: MAX E. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CROZER-KEYSTONE HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: ALYSE F. STACH
Represented By: CARL W. HITTINGER
Represented By: ANDREW MICHAEL GROSSMAN
Represented By: GREGORY J. COMMINS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHANNONDELL, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN A. MCCALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS
Represented By: RICHARD P. LIMBURG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kessler Institute for Rehabilitation
Represented By: PAUL C. TROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NON-PARTY SABER HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM J. MUNDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP
Represented By: MARK J. BOTTI
Represented By: ANDREW GEORGE
Represented By: IAIN R. MCPHIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: ALYSE F. STACH
Represented By: CARL W. HITTINGER
Represented By: ANDREW MICHAEL GROSSMAN
Represented By: GREGORY J. COMMINS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CIGNA CORPORATION
Represented By: DANIEL J. HOWLEY
Represented By: MARGOT CAMPBELL
Represented By: ROBERT A. BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kindred Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: ERIC H. JASO
Represented By: THOMAS M. KENNY
Represented By: JASON C. SPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ST. MARY REHABILITATION HOSPITAL
Represented By: SAMANTHA L. SOUTHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AETNA, INC.
Represented By: JUSTIN M. ROMEO
Represented By: RANI A. HABASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HEALTH PARTNERS PLANS, INC.
Represented By: SHANNON HAMPTON SUTHERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: TYSON Y. HERROLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: PATRICK D. DORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: AristaCare Health Services
Represented By: PAULA G. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?