CLEAR CHANNEL OUTDOOR, LLC v. JECA CORP
Plaintiff: CLEAR CHANNEL OUTDOOR, LLC
Defendant: JECA CORP
Case Number: 2:2020cv01476
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED VIA TELEPHONE FOR 6/8/2020 AT 10:30 AM IN COURTROOM 6A BEFORE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/30/20. 4/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JECA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(HIMSWORTH, MARK)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GRAHAM R. BICKEL on behalf of JECA CORP with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BICKEL, GRAHAM)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK F. HIMSWORTH on behalf of JECA CORP with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HIMSWORTH, MARK)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CLEAR CHANNEL OUTDOOR, LLC re #4 Letter,, AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (SUTHERLAND, SHANNON)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 Letter dated 4/24/20 from Judge Kenney's chambers addressed to Shannon Hampton Sutherland, Esq. A review of the Courts records shows that a pleading has not been filed in the above-captioned action in response to the complaint.If such a pleading is not filed by the above-named defendant on or before May 18, 2020, you may file a request with the clerk for entry of default in accordance with Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.If the Request for Default is not filed by May 25, 2020, the Court may enter an order dismissing the case against the above-named defendant for lack of prosecution.Plaintiffs Counsel is to serve a copy of this Rule 55 Letter on Defendant JECA Corp and file proof of same. (mbh, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Gerard Menichini re: served Summons, Complaint, and Disclosure Statement upon Edward Kradoska by Personal on 3/25/2020 (SUTHERLAND, SHANNON)
March 18, 2020 1 Summons Issued as to JECA CORP. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 3/18/2020 (bw, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent CLEAR CHANNEL OUTDOOR HOLDINGS, INC. for CLEAR CHANNEL OUTDOOR, LLC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. by CLEAR CHANNEL OUTDOOR, LLC.(bw, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JECA CORP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE213123.), filed by CLEAR CHANNEL OUTDOOR, LLC.(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLEAR CHANNEL OUTDOOR, LLC v. JECA CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JECA CORP
Represented By: GRAHAM R. BICKEL
Represented By: MARK F. HIMSWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEAR CHANNEL OUTDOOR, LLC
Represented By: SHANNON HAMPTON SUTHERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?