ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. SIPPEL BROTHERS LLC
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: SIPPEL BROTHERS LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01505
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM P. BARRETT on behalf of SIPPEL BROTHERS LLC with Jury Demand(BARRETT, WILLIAM)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY re: Jeff Nugent served Summons and Complaint upon SIPPEL BROTHERS LLC by Personal. SIPPEL BROTHERS LLC served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)
April 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to SIPPEL BROTHERS LLC. E-mailed To: JOSEPH L. MCGLYNN, ESQ. on 4/14/2020 (dmc, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SIPPEL BROTHERS LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14189391.), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. SIPPEL BROTHERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH L. MCGLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIPPEL BROTHERS LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM P. BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?