Sesso v. EAGLEVILLE HOSPITAL
Plaintiff: Donald J Sesso
Defendant: EAGLEVILLE HOSPITAL
Case Number: 2:2020cv01603
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donald J Sesso. EAGLEVILLE HOSPITAL waiver sent on 4/10/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (POLLINS, SCOTT)
April 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to EAGLEVILLE HOSPITAL. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/9/20 (jaa, ) Modified on 4/10/2020 (tjd).
March 25, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Donald J Sesso. (tjd, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EAGLEVILLE HOSPITAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14198580.), filed by Donald J Sesso.(POLLINS, SCOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sesso v. EAGLEVILLE HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLEVILLE HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J Sesso
Represented By: SCOTT M. POLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?