PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. v. CATERPILLAR INC. et al
Plaintiff: PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.
Defendant: CATERPILLAR INC. and FOLEY, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2020cv01628
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by FOLEY, INCORPORATED. (PULLANO, MICHAEL)
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 Response IN OPPOSITION re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (MICCIOLO, MEGHAN)
July 20, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by CATERPILLAR INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FINE, HEATHER)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by FOLEY, INCORPORATED.Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(PULLANO, MICHAEL)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #15 ) AND THE MOTION TO JOIN IN CO-DEFENDANT FOLEY INCORPORATED'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #16 ) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/10/20.7/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #13 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/6/20.7/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED against CATERPILLAR INC., FOLEY, INCORPORATED, filed by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(MICCIOLO, MEGHAN)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint - Joining Defendant Foley, Incorporated's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by CATERPILLAR INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service)(FINE, HEATHER)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by FOLEY, INCORPORATED.Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(PULLANO, MICHAEL)
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CATERPILLAR INC., FOLEY, INCORPORATED, filed by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(MICCIOLO, MEGHAN)
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FOLEY, INCORPORATED.Memo, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(PULLANO, MICHAEL)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by CATERPILLAR INC..(FINE, HEATHER)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with 05/13/2020 by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO..(MICCIOLO, MEGHAN)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement filed by CATERPILLAR INC...(FINE, HEATHER) Modified on 5/7/2020 (nd, ).
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by FOLEY, INCORPORATED.(PULLANO, MICHAEL)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER RUSSELL FINE on behalf of CATERPILLAR INC. with Jury Demand(FINE, HEATHER)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. CATERPILLAR INC. waiver sent on 4/10/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (MICCIOLO, MEGHAN) Modified on 5/5/2020 (lvj, ).
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. BORELLI on behalf of FOLEY, INCORPORATED with Certificate of Service(BORELLI, JOHN)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL B. PULLANO on behalf of FOLEY, INCORPORATED with Certificate of Service(PULLANO, MICHAEL)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. FOLEY, INCORPORATED waiver sent on 4/10/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (MICCIOLO, MEGHAN) Modified on 5/4/2020 (lvj, ).
April 9, 2020 1 EMAILED Summons Issued as to CATERPILLAR INC., FOLEY, INCORPORATED. Forwarded To: MEGAN MICCIOLO on 4/9/20 (jl, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. as to FOLEY, INCORPORATED. (MICCIOLO, MEGHAN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Returned Unexecuted by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. as to CATERPILLAR INC.. (MICCIOLO, MEGHAN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CATERPILLAR INC., FOLEY, INCORPORATED ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14202198.), filed by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MICCIOLO, MEGHAN) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2020: #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form) (lvj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. v. CATERPILLAR INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: MEGHAN P. MICCIOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR INC.
Represented By: HEATHER RUSSELL FINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOLEY, INCORPORATED
Represented By: JOHN M. BORELLI
Represented By: MICHAEL B. PULLANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?