Davis v. C&D Security Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hope Davis
Defendant: Universal Protection Services, LLC and C&D Security Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01758
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ROBERT T. QUACKENBOSS, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/29/20. 5/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ROBERT QUACKENBOSS WITH ECF FORMS; E-MAILED.(amas, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss , Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Strike Certain Individual and Class Allegations, filed by C&D Security Management, Inc., Universal Protection Services, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SAUNDERS, BRIAN)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Universal Protection Service, LP; Universal Services of America, LP; and Allied Universal Topco LLC with Certificate of Service by Universal Protection Services, LLC.(SAUNDERS, BRIAN)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert T. Quackenboss by C&D Security Management, Inc., Universal Protection Services, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14319488.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAUNDERS, BRIAN)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN L. SAUNDERS on behalf of C&D Security Management, Inc., Universal Protection Services, LLC with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form)(SAUNDERS, BRIAN)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC R. EDELMAN on behalf of Hope Davis with Certificate of Service(EDELMAN, MARC)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Davis re: Francis DiMeo, III served Summons and Complaint upon Universal Protection Services, LLC by Process Server. Universal Protection Services, LLC served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (MURTHY, ANGELI)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Davis re: Francis DiMeo, III served Summons and Complaint upon C&D Security Management, Inc. by Process Server. C&D Security Management, Inc. served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (MURTHY, ANGELI)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARC R. EDELMAN, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/16/20. 4/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO MARC EDELMAN WITH ECF FORMS; E-MAILED.(amas, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marc R. Edelman by Hope Davis. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14240213.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MURTHY, ANGELI)
April 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to C&D Security Management, Inc., Universal Protection Services, LLC. Forwarded To: Emailed to Plaintiffs Counsel on 04/09/2020 (nd, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against C&D Security Management, Inc., Universal Protection Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14214983.), filed by Hope Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form)(MURTHY, ANGELI) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2020: #3 Designation Form) (lvj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. C&D Security Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Protection Services, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT T. QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: BRIAN L. SAUNDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&D Security Management, Inc.
Represented By: ROBERT T. QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: BRIAN L. SAUNDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Davis
Represented By: ANGELI MURTHY
Represented By: MARC R. EDELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?