LEWIS v. SPEEDWAY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JAMES LEWIS
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC and SPEEDWAY, LLC (STORE -0006796)
3Rd Party Plaintiff: SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Rich Grossi Snow Removal
Case Number: 2:2020cv01833
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Pretrial Conference held on 11/16/20. (JL )
November 2, 2020 Filing 24 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, )
November 2, 2020 DOC.S 20, 21, 22, AND 23 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL ATTEND A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE WITH THE COURT ON NOVEMBER 16, 2020 AT 11:30 A.M. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/30/20. 10/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (jaa, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON MARCH 30, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M., BEFORE THE HONORABLE MARILYN HEFFLEY, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, ROOM 3040, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 10/30/20. 10/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (jaa, ) Modified on 10/30/2020 (jaa, ).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED THAT THE COURT ACCEPTS THE LETTER AS RICH GROSS SNOW REMOVALS ANSWER TO SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE, LLCS THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 11). SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/29/20. 10/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (jaa, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/27/2021 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/19/2021. MOTIONS DUE BY 5/21/2021. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 7/1/2021. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 5/21/2021. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 7/20/2021. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 7/20/2021. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 9/2/2021 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/29/20. 10/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) *NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Pretrial Conference held on 10/28/20 (jaa, )
October 14, 2020 PLEADING #17, #18 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (JL )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MAIL A COPY OF THE PRO SE GUIDELINES TO THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT RICH GROSSI SNOW REMOVAL; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/13/20. 10/13/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(JL )
October 13, 2020 DOC NO. 16 MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 10/13/2020. (kp, )
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON OCTOBER 28, 2020, AT 11:30 A.M. AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/9/20. 10/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) Modified on 10/9/2020 (jaa, ). *NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Pretrial Conference held on 10/9/20 (jaa, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 Letter Response dated 9/29/20 by Rich Grossi Snow Removal. (fdc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES LEWIS re: JODI BRODER served Summons and JOINDER Complaint upon Rich Grossi Snow Removal by PERSONAL SERVICE. Rich Grossi Snow Removal served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (JL )
August 18, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #12 ON 8/18/20. (jaa, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED THAT THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 15, 2020 (DOC. NO. 10) IS CANCELLED. THE COURT WILL RESCHEDULE THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AFTER RICH GROSSI SNOW REMOVAL ENTERS AN APPEARANCE IN THE CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 7/10/20. 7/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(jaa, )
July 10, 2020 Third Party Summons Issued as to Rich Grossi Snow Removal. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/10/20 (jaa, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Rich Grossi Snow Removal, filed by SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Case Management Track)(RAY, GREG)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON JULY 15, 2020, AT 10:00 A.M. AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/25/20. 6/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against SPEEDWAY, LLC, SPEEDWAY, LLC (STORE -0006796) by SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE LLC.(RAY, GREG)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE LLC.(RAY, GREG)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GREG A. RAY on behalf of SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE LLC (RAY, GREG)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants Speedway ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE LLC by SPEEDWAY, LLC (STORE -0006796), SPEEDWAY, LLC.(MURRAY, JAMES)
June 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE LLC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/1/20 (jaa, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SPEEDWAY, LLC, SPEEDWAY, LLC (STORE -0006796),and SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE LLC. filed by JAMES LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Writ v Shields, #3 Exhibit Stipulation to Amend Complaint)(LASSITER, DUANE) Modified on 5/29/2020 (tjd).
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/12/20 (jaa, )
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON MAY 12, 2020, AT 11:30 A.M. AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/13/20. 4/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY, Corporate Parent MPC INVESTMENT LLC for SPEEDWAY, LLC. by SPEEDWAY, LLC, SPEEDWAY, LLC (STORE -0006796).(tjd)
April 8, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JAMES LEWIS. (tjd)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SPEEDWAY, LLC (STORE -0006796), SPEEDWAY, LLC from Court of Common Pleas 191200650 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14225107), filed by SPEEDWAY, LLC (STORE -0006796), SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Disclosure Statement, #7 Exhibit Docket)(MURRAY, JAMES) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/9/2020) (tjd, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/9/2020) (tjd). Modified on 4/9/2020 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS v. SPEEDWAY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LEWIS
Represented By: DUANE L. LASSITER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC
Represented By: JAMES A. MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC (STORE -0006796)
Represented By: JAMES A. MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE LLC
Represented By: GREG A. RAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rich Grossi Snow Removal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?