Alvarado v. The Philadelphia Inquirer, LLC
Plaintiff: Jose Alvarado
Defendant: The Philadelphia Inquirer, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01854
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jose Alvarado (LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE TIME BY WHICH DEFENDANT THE PHILADELPHIA INQUIRER, LLC, SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 6/3/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 4/29/20. 4/29/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 Letter Request for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by The Philadelphia Inquirer, LLC..(BERRY, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/29/2020 (lisad, ).
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL BERRY on behalf of The Philadelphia Inquirer, LLC with Certificate of Service(BERRY, MICHAEL)
April 10, 2020 1 Summons Issued as to The Philadelphia Inquirer, LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 4/10/20 (jl, )
April 10, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jose Alvarado. (lisad, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Philadelphia Inquirer, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14229197.), filed by Jose Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Case Management Track Form, #6 Designation Form)(LIEBOWITZ, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado v. The Philadelphia Inquirer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Philadelphia Inquirer, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alvarado
Represented By: RICHARD P. LIEBOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?