CARTEE-HARING v. CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Plaintiff: REBECCA CARTEE-HARING
Defendant: CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 2:2020cv01995
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by REBECCA CARTEE-HARING. CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (MAZUREK, EDWARD)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID WILLIAM BROWN on behalf of CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(BROWN, DAVID)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL I. LEVIN on behalf of CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(LEVIN, MICHAEL)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/27/2020 (bw, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT filed by REBECCA CARTEE-HARING.(MAZUREK, EDWARD) Modified on 4/24/2020 (tjd).
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by REBECCA CARTEE-HARING. (tjd)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14250802.), filed by REBECCA CARTEE-HARING.(MAZUREK, EDWARD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2020: #1 Cover Sheets) (tjd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTEE-HARING v. CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL BUCKS SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: DAVID WILLIAM BROWN
Represented By: MICHAEL I. LEVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA CARTEE-HARING
Represented By: EDWARD S. MAZUREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?