ADELPHIA GATEWAY, LLC v. TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 0.022 ACRES IN CITY OF CHESTER, DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA et al
Plaintiff: ADELPHIA GATEWAY, LLC
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER PADEN, NICHOLAS PADEN, ERIC PADEN, ROBERT PADEN, JR., DARYL ANTONIO PADEN, RONALD PADEN and TIANA PADEN JONES
Case Number: 2:2020cv02069
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE: THE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #12 AND THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #13 ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/26/2020. 6/27/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
June 27, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #12 AND MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #13 . SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/26/2020. 6/27/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ADELPHIA GATEWAY, LLC.Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession of Rights of Way, Declaration of Keith Edmonds and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order with Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Keith Edmonds with Exhibits 1 & 2, #4 Memorandum of Law, #5 Certificate of Service)(WITMER, ELIZABETH)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ADELPHIA GATEWAY, LLC.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Declaration of Keith Edmonds, #4 Memorandum, #5 Certificate of Service)(O'NEILL, SEAN)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kevin J. Lewis re: served Verified Complaint, Notice of Condemnation, Entries of Appearance (2), Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Case Mgmt Track and Disclosure Statement upon Eric Paden by personal on May 17, 2020 (WITMER, ELIZABETH)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kay Dean re: served Verified Complaint, Notice of Condemnation, Entries of Appearance (2), Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Case Mgmt Track and Disclosure Statement upon Daryl Antonio Paden (via spouse Steven Rendell Thornton) by Personal (adult in charge) on May 5, 2020 (WITMER, ELIZABETH)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by David E. Cox, Jr. re: served Verified Complaint, Notice of Condemnation, Entries of Appearance (2), Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Case Mgmt Track and Disclosure Statement upon Ronald Paden (via Ryan Paden adult son) by Personal (adult in charge) on May 1, 2020 (WITMER, ELIZABETH)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by David E. Cox, Jr. re: served Verified Complaint, Notice of Condemnation, Entries of Appearance (2), Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Case Mgmt Track and Disclosure Statement upon Nicholas Paden (via Crystal Cooper adult in charge) by Personal (adult in charge) on May 1, 2020 (WITMER, ELIZABETH)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by David E. Cox, Jr. re: served Verified Complaint, Notice of Condemnation, Entries of Appearance (2), Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Case Mgmt Track and Disclosure Statement upon Christopher Paden (via Crystal Cooper adult in charge) by Personal (adult in charge) on May 1, 2020 (WITMER, ELIZABETH)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by David E. Cox, Jr. re: served Verified Complaint, Notice of Condemnation, Entries of Appearance (2), Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Case Mgmt Track and Disclosure Statement upon Tiana Paden Jones (via Kendal Jones, husband) by Personal (adult in charge) on May 1, 2020 (WITMER, ELIZABETH)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by David E. Cox, Jr. re: served Verified Complaint, Notice of Condemnation, Entries of Appearance (2), Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Case Mgmt Track and Disclosure Statement upon Robert Paden Jr. by personal on May 5, 2020 (WITMER, ELIZABETH)
April 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to TIANA PADEN JONES, CHRISTOPHER PADEN, DARYL ANTONIO PADEN, ERIC PADEN, NICHOLAS PADEN, ROBERT PADEN, JR, RONALD PADEN, TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 0.022 ACRES IN CITY OF CHESTER, DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/30/2020 (bw, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN T. O'NEILL on behalf of ADELPHIA GATEWAY, LLC (O'NEILL, SEAN)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including NJR Midstream Company is a direct, wholly owned subsidiary of NJR Midstream Holdings Corporation; which is a direct, wholly owned subsidiary of NJR Energy Investments Corporation; which is a direct wholly owned subsidiary of New Jersey Resources Corporation. NJR Midstream Company owns a 100 percent interest in Adelphia Gateway, LLC. New Jersey Resources Corporation (NYSE:NJR) is a publicly held corporation that has no parent companies. BlackRock, Inc., which is a publicly held corporation, has a greater than 10% ownership interest in New Jersey Resources Corporation. The Vanguard Group, a privately held registered investment advisor, also owns a greater than 10% interest in New Jersey Resources Corporation. BlackRock, Inc. (NYSE:BLK) is a publicly held corporation that has no parent companies. The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., which is a publicly held corporation, has a greater than 10% ownership interest in BlackRock, Inc. The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. (NYSE: PNC) is a publicly held corporation that has no parent companies, and no publicly held corporation has a 10% or greater ownership interest in The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. by ADELPHIA GATEWAY, LLC.(WITMER, ELIZABETH)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH UTZ WITMER on behalf of ADELPHIA GATEWAY, LLC (WITMER, ELIZABETH)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN CONDEMNATION OF PROPERTY PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 71.1 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14264486.), filed by ADELPHIA GATEWAY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Notice of Condemnation)(WITMER, ELIZABETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADELPHIA GATEWAY, LLC v. TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 0.022 ACRES IN CITY OF CHESTER, DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER PADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS PADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC PADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT PADEN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARYL ANTONIO PADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD PADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIANA PADEN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADELPHIA GATEWAY, LLC
Represented By: ELIZABETH UTZ WITMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?