ALLEN v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Lee Allen
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Case Number: 2:2020cv02183
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, filed by Mary Lee Allen and LEONARD ALMOND.(BECKER, TIMOTHY) Modified on 6/30/2020 (tjd).
June 25, 2020 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(MILLER, CHANDA)
June 23, 2020 Filing 24 Report Of 26(f) Conference by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (MILLER, CHANDA)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 6/26/2020 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/23/20. 6/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/25/2020 03:00 PM VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE, COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE DIAL IN INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov IN Philadelphia BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report Discovery Plan)(amw, )
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #17 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 06/15/2020.06/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 06/15/2020.06/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 06/15/2020.06/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 06/15/2020.06/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Tracie J. Renfroe ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14347966.) filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Certificate of Service.(MILLER, CHANDA)
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Rose J. Hunter Jones ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14347956.) filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Certificate of Service.(MILLER, CHANDA)
June 11, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Kristen R. Fournier ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14347919.) filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Certificate of Service.(MILLER, CHANDA)
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice R. Bruce Hurley ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14347861.) filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Certificate of Service.(MILLER, CHANDA)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MARY LEE ALLEN AND DEFENDANTS JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON (DEFENDANTS) THAT THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED FROM JUNE 3, 2020 TO JUNE 23, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/1/20. 6/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CHANDA A MILLER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MILLER, CHANDA)
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. ABERNETHY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 05/21/2020.05/21/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jacob Rusch ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14300323.) filed by Mary Lee Allen.Certificate of Service.(WEISS, SOL)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 05/12/2020.05/12/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 05/12/2020.05/12/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Timothy Becker ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14286227.) filed by Mary Lee Allen.Certificate of Service.(WEISS, SOL)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Stacy Hauer ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14286185.) filed by Mary Lee Allen.Certificate of Service.(WEISS, SOL)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SHAYNA SLATER on behalf of Mary Lee Allen with Certificate of Service(SLATER, SHAYNA)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS R. ANAPOL on behalf of Mary Lee Allen with Certificate of Service(ANAPOL, THOMAS)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by PAOLA PEARSON on behalf of Mary Lee Allen with Certificate of Service(PEARSON, PAOLA)
May 7, 2020 Summons Issued as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. E-mailed To: SOL H. WEISS, ESQ. on 5/7/2020 (dmc, )
May 6, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mary Lee Allen. (tjd)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14278027.), filed by Mary Lee Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(WEISS, SOL) Modified on 5/7/2020 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lee Allen
Represented By: SOL H. WEISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?