FOUNDATION FOR ELDERCARE et al
Plaintiff: JOHN G. BERG and FOUNDATION FOR ELDERCARE
Defendant: ROCCO CRESCENZO and ROCCO J. CRESCENZO
Case Number: 2:2020cv02190
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL JULY 8, 2020 TO RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/23/2020. 6/23/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT #9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS DEEMED MOOT THE #13 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/8/2020.6/8/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED ONLY.(sfl, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ROCCO J. CRESCENZO..(CLARKE, GERALD)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ROCCO J. CRESCENZO.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(CLARKE, GERALD)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FOUNDATION FOR ELDERCARE (SOIFER, MARK)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 Statement In support of Motion for Extension of Time by ROCCO J. CRESCENZO. (CLARKE, GERALD)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by ROCCO J. CRESCENZO.certificate of service.(CLARKE, GERALD)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/18/2020.5/18/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Mark Soifer, Esquire filed by JOHN G. BERG, FOUNDATION FOR ELDERCARE.Declaration.(BARR, BRIAN)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD R. CLARKE on behalf of ROCCO J. CRESCENZO (CLARKE, GERALD)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT AND ORDER THAT THE SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY IS HEREBY APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/14/20. 5/14/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING #2 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card), filed by JOHN G. BERG, FOUNDATION FOR ELDERCARE. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/13/2020. 5/14/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney Fredric L Shenkman filed by JOHN G. BERG, FOUNDATION FOR ELDERCARE..(BARR, BRIAN) Modified on 5/12/2020 (lvj, ).
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Soifer by JOHN G. BERG, FOUNDATION FOR ELDERCARE. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14283064.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SHENKMAN, FREDRIC)
May 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to ROCCO J. CRESCENZO. E-mailed To: FREDRIC L. SHENKMAN, ESQ. on 5/8/2020 (dmc, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Foundation for Eldercare and John G. Berg against ROCCO CRESCENZO ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14279847.), filed by FOUNDATION FOR ELDERCARE, JOHN G. BERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form Designation Form, #4 Exhibit Exhibits)(SHENKMAN, FREDRIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOUNDATION FOR ELDERCARE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCCO CRESCENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCCO J. CRESCENZO
Represented By: GERALD R. CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN G. BERG
Represented By: FREDRIC L. SHENKMAN
Represented By: BRIAN D. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOUNDATION FOR ELDERCARE
Represented By: FREDRIC L. SHENKMAN
Represented By: BRIAN D. BARR
Represented By: MARK SOIFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?