DOE et al v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: HEATHER DOE, JAMES DOE, BRENNAN DOE and LISA DOE
Defendant: PA EDUCATION SEC. PEDRO A. RIVERA, GOVERNOR THOMAS W. WOLF and PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv02320
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/10/20. 6/10/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(PEPPER, JAMES)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. ANZALONE on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, PEDRO A. RIVERA with Certificate of Service(ANZALONE, ELIZABETH)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. KOVATIS on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, PEDRO A. RIVERA, THOMAS W. WOLF with Certificate of Service(KOVATIS, STEPHEN)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT, IN ORDER FOR THE COURT TO RULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION UNDER THE FACTS ALLEGED AND THE RELIEF REQUESTED, THE COURT WILL REQUIRE A PLEADING FROM DEFENDANTS AND A FULL SCHEDULING WITH OPPORTUNITY FOR BOTH SIDES TO BE FULLY HEARD AT EVERY STEP OF THE PROCESS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/28/20. 5/28/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES MUST MEET AND CONFER REGARDING THE TIME AND STEPS THEY NEED TO RESPOND TO AND PREPARE FOR THE HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AS WELL AS COMPLETE THE HEARINGS, FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS (IF ANY), COMPLETE A RECORD FOR THE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE SOLE ISSUE OF THE INDIVIDUAL STUDENT-PLAINTIFFS' PARENTS' CLAIMS FOR RELIEF, RESPONSES, REPLIES, AND DATE(S) FOR THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/26/20. 5/26/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST DEFENDANTS filed by BRENNAN DOE, HEATHER DOE, JAMES DOE, LISA DOE.Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Exhibit)(PEPPER, JAMES) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/26/2020) (lvj, ).
May 23, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES DOE, LISA DOE, HEATHER DOE, BRENNAN DOE. All Defendants served on 5/21/20 and answer 7/20/20. (PEPPER, JAMES) Modified on 5/26/2020 (lvj, ).
May 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, PEDRO A. RIVERA, THOMAS W. WOLF. Forwarded To: James Joseph Pepper on 5/18/20 (fdc, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14296923.), filed by JAMES DOE, LISA DOE, HEATHER DOE, BRENNAN DOE.(PEPPER, JAMES) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2020: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form) (lvj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE et al v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER DOE
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH PEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES DOE
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH PEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENNAN DOE
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH PEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA DOE
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH PEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA EDUCATION SEC. PEDRO A. RIVERA
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. ANZALONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNOR THOMAS W. WOLF
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. ANZALONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?