MONTGOMERY COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT NO. 23 v. K.S. et al
Plaintiff: MONTGOMERY COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT NO. 23
Defendant: F.S. and K.S.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02330
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 Administrative Record. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (nd, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2020: #1 Administrative Record Part 2, #2 Administrative Record Part 3, #3 Administrative Record Part 4, #4 Administrative Record Part 5, #5 Administrative Record Part 6) (nd, ).
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A STIPULATED RECORD ON OR BEFORE JULY 24, 2020. NO LATER THAN AUGUST 7, 2020, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE AND SERVE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO LATER THAN AUGUST 14, 2020, AND RESPONSES TO THE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN AUGUST 28, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/15/20. 7/15/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. A Rule 16 Conference was held on 7/15/20. (fdc)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 Response re #10 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by MONTGOMERY COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT NO. 23. (GILSBACH, TIMOTHY)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint together with Includes counterclaim and cross-claim , CROSSCLAIM against MONTGOMERY COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT NO. 23, COUNTERCLAIM against MONTGOMERY COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT NO. 23 by F.S., K.S.(IN THEIR OWN RIGHT), K.S.(BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, K.S. AND F.S.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service For Answer and Counterclaim)(GOLDSHAW, LEONA)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by F.S., K.S.(IN THEIR OWN RIGHT), K.S.(BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, K.S. AND F.S.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service For Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting)(GOLDSHAW, LEONA)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by F.S., K.S.(IN THEIR OWN RIGHT), K.S.(BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, K.S. AND F.S.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(GOLDSHAW, LEONA)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #6 ) IS GRANTED AND THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/2/20.7/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Seal the Administrative Record filed by MONTGOMERY COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT NO. 23.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(GILSBACH, TIMOTHY)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 7/15/20 AT 9:30 AM IN ROOM 9614 BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/24/20. 6/24/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LEONA Z. GOLDSHAW on behalf of F.S., K.S.(IN THEIR OWN RIGHT), K.S.(BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, K.S. AND F.S.) with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSHAW, LEONA)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CARYL A. OBERMAN on behalf of F.S., K.S.(IN THEIR OWN RIGHT), K.S.(BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, K.S. AND F.S.) with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(OBERMAN, CARYL)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MONTGOMERY COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT NO. 23. F.S. waiver sent on 5/19/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; K.S.(IN THEIR OWN RIGHT) waiver sent on 5/19/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; K.S.(BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, K.S. AND F.S.) waiver sent on 5/19/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (GILSBACH, TIMOTHY)
May 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to F.S., K.S.(IN THEIR OWN RIGHT), K.S.(BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, K.S. AND F.S.). EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/19/20 (jaa, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against F.S., K.S.(IN THEIR OWN RIGHT), K.S.(BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, K.S. AND F.S.) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14298584.), filed by MONTGOMERY COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT NO. 23. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(GILSBACH, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTGOMERY COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT NO. 23 v. K.S. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTGOMERY COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT NO. 23
Represented By: TIMOTHY E. GILSBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.S.
Represented By: LEONA Z. GOLDSHAW
Represented By: CARYL A. OBERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.S.
Represented By: LEONA Z. GOLDSHAW
Represented By: CARYL A. OBERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?