Bell v. THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE CO.
Plaintiff: Christopher Bell
Defendant: THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv02390
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLYANNE PARRY INVERSO on behalf of Christopher Bell (INVERSO, KELLYANNE)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/28/2020. 5/29/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
May 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ON 5/21/2020/ (rf, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE CO. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14305980.), filed by Christopher Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(SNYDER, MARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bell
Represented By: MARC H. SNYDER
Represented By: KELLYANNE PARRY INVERSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?