CLARE v. JJR, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS CLARE
Defendant: JJR, LLC and JOHN J. REILLY
Case Number: 2:2020cv02786
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by DENNIS CLARE. (HAMILTON, DEXTER)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/27/20. 7/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT ELISABETH C. ROSS, ESQ. IS ADMITTED IN THIS CASE AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFF.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/23/20. 7/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by SHARI MAYNARD on behalf of JJR, LLC, JJR, LLC, JOHN J. REILLY with Certificate of Service(MAYNARD, SHARI)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elisabeth Ross by DENNIS CLARE. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14443252.). (HAMILTON, DEXTER)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE: A telephone pretrial conference will be held on August 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno. Call-in instructions are outlined herein. (nds)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO ADMIT ELISABETH C. ROSS, ESQ FOR PLAINTIFF IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE DUE TO BOTH THE APPLICANT AND SPONSOR NOT SIGNING AND COMPLETING THE APPLICATION. MR. HAMILTON IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED APPLICATION BY 8/31/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/21/20. 7/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elisabeth C. Ross by DENNIS CLARE. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14436871.). (HAMILTON, DEXTER)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by JJR, LLC, JJR, LLC, JOHN J. REILLY.(BIXLER, ALBERT)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' HAVE UNTIL 7/20/20 TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/10/20. 7/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 Stipulation (Request) to Extend Defendants' Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by DENNIS CLARE. (HAMILTON, DEXTER) Modified on 7/13/2020 (fb).
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kelly Duffy re: served Summons upon Herbert B. Rosenberg by Federal Express on June 19, 2020 (HAMILTON, DEXTER)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Karl Brown re: served Summons upon John J. Reilly by personal service on June 20, 2020 (HAMILTON, DEXTER)
June 12, 2020 Summons Issued as to JJR, LLC and JOHN J. REILLY. E-mailed to counsel on 6/12/20 (mbh, )
June 11, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DENNIS CLARE. (fb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14347691.), filed by DENNIS CLARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note 200K, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note 300K, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form, #5 Designation Form Designation Form)(HAMILTON, DEXTER) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/12/2020) (fb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARE v. JJR, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJR, LLC
Represented By: ALBERT G. BIXLER
Represented By: SHARI MAYNARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN J. REILLY
Represented By: ALBERT G. BIXLER
Represented By: SHARI MAYNARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS CLARE
Represented By: DEXTER R. HAMILTON
Represented By: ELISABETH C. ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?