HAVERFORD REALTY INVESTMENT CORP T/A HAVERFORD REALTY ASSOCIATES v. SLEEPY'S LLC
Plaintiff: HAVERFORD REALTY INVESTMENT CORP T/A HAVERFORD REALTY ASSOCIATES
Defendant: SLEEPY'S LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02818
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 8/18/2020, AT 11:00 AM, BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ, ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/27/20. 7/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Montogmery County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Answer, #3 Jury Demand, #4 Entry of Appearance, #5 Affidavit, #6 Removal, #7 Papers forwarded)(nd, )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/6/20. 7/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 Response to New Matter and Answer to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by HAVERFORD REALTY INVESTMENT CORP T/A HAVERFORD REALTY ASSOCIATES. (UTAIN, DANIEL)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HAVERFORD REALTY INVESTMENT CORP T/A HAVERFORD REALTY ASSOCIATES.(UTAIN, DANIEL)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SLEEPY'S LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14351233), filed by SLEEPY'S LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case Management Track Form, #5 Designation Form, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement Form)(GINSBURG TUFFS, CHIMDI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAVERFORD REALTY INVESTMENT CORP T/A HAVERFORD REALTY ASSOCIATES v. SLEEPY'S LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLEEPY'S LLC
Represented By: CHIMDI NWOSU GINSBURG TUFFS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAVERFORD REALTY INVESTMENT CORP T/A HAVERFORD REALTY ASSOCIATES
Represented By: DANIEL R. UTAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?