UPPER GWYNEDD EQUITIES, LLC et al v. PROVCO PINEGOOD SUMNEYTOWN, LLC et al
Plaintiff: UPPER GWYNEDD EQUITIES, LLC and RETAIL SITES, LLC
Defendant: PROVCO GROUP LLC, PROVCO REAL ESTATE, PROVCO VENTURES I, L.P., BRUCE GOODMAN, JOHN DOES NOS. 1 TO 10, WAWA, INC., PROVCO PINEGOOD SUMNEYTOWN, LLC, GERALD HOLTZ, ABC ENTITIES NOS. 1 TO 5 and THE PROVCO GROUP, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02819
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 7/27/20.7/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. GALLAGHER, IV on behalf of WAWA, INC. (GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Uncontested) filed by WAWA, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery, #2 Certificate of Counsel, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(JOHN, LESLIE)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/20/2020 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 7/22/2020. 7/22/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTHA GUARNIERI on behalf of BRUCE GOODMAN, GERALD HOLTZ, PROVCO GROUP LLC, PROVCO PINEGOOD SUMNEYTOWN, LLC, PROVCO REAL ESTATE, PROVCO VENTURES I, L.P., THE PROVCO GROUP, LTD. with Certificate of Service(GUARNIERI, MARTHA)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK H. GRIFFIN, IV on behalf of BRUCE GOODMAN, GERALD HOLTZ, PROVCO GROUP LLC, PROVCO PINEGOOD SUMNEYTOWN, LLC, PROVCO REAL ESTATE, PROVCO VENTURES I, L.P., THE PROVCO GROUP, LTD. with Certificate of Service(GRIFFIN, FRANK)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILIA L. MCKEE VASSALLO on behalf of WAWA, INC. (MCKEE VASSALLO, EMILIA)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD D. ROGERS on behalf of WAWA, INC. (ROGERS, EDWARD)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS HAVE UNTIL 8/28/20 TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 7/13/20. 7/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to BRUCE GOODMAN, GERALD HOLTZ, PROVCO GROUP LLC, PROVCO PINEGOOD SUMNEYTOWN, LLC, PROVCO REAL ESTATE, PROVCO VENTURES I, L.P., THE PROVCO GROUP, LTD., WAWA, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/16/2020 (bw, )
June 12, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RETAIL SITES, LLC, UPPER GWYNEDD EQUITIES, LLC. (lisad, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RETAIL SITES, LLC, UPPER GWYNEDD EQUITIES, LLC.(SMITH, ERIC)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14351252.), filed by RETAIL SITES, LLC, UPPER GWYNEDD EQUITIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Designation Form)(SMITH, ERIC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2020: #9 Designation Form) (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UPPER GWYNEDD EQUITIES, LLC et al v. PROVCO PINEGOOD SUMNEYTOWN, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROVCO GROUP LLC
Represented By: MARTHA GUARNIERI
Represented By: BARBARA T. SICALIDES
Represented By: FRANK H. GRIFFIN, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROVCO REAL ESTATE
Represented By: MARTHA GUARNIERI
Represented By: BARBARA T. SICALIDES
Represented By: FRANK H. GRIFFIN, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROVCO VENTURES I, L.P.
Represented By: MARTHA GUARNIERI
Represented By: BARBARA T. SICALIDES
Represented By: FRANK H. GRIFFIN, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE GOODMAN
Represented By: MARTHA GUARNIERI
Represented By: BARBARA T. SICALIDES
Represented By: FRANK H. GRIFFIN, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES NOS. 1 TO 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAWA, INC.
Represented By: EDWARD D. ROGERS
Represented By: THOMAS J. GALLAGHER, IV
Represented By: LESLIE E. JOHN
Represented By: EMILIA L. MCKEE VASSALLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROVCO PINEGOOD SUMNEYTOWN, LLC
Represented By: MARTHA GUARNIERI
Represented By: BARBARA T. SICALIDES
Represented By: FRANK H. GRIFFIN, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD HOLTZ
Represented By: MARTHA GUARNIERI
Represented By: BARBARA T. SICALIDES
Represented By: FRANK H. GRIFFIN, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC ENTITIES NOS. 1 TO 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROVCO GROUP, LTD.
Represented By: MARTHA GUARNIERI
Represented By: BARBARA T. SICALIDES
Represented By: FRANK H. GRIFFIN, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPPER GWYNEDD EQUITIES, LLC
Represented By: ERIC B. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RETAIL SITES, LLC
Represented By: ERIC B. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?