LIZARDO v. CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT OPERATING COMPANY, INC. D/B/A HARRAH'S CASINO et al
Plaintiff: DANIELA LIZARDO
Defendant: RICHARD WILLIAMS, JOHN/JANE DOES, NOS. 1-5, JHL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT OPERATING COMPANY, INC. D/B/A HARRAH'S CASINO, JOHN/JANE DOE CORPORATIONS, NOS. 1-5, CHESTER DOWNS AND MARINA, LLC D/B/A HARRAH'S PHILADELPHIA CASINO & RACETRACK and HARRAH'S CASINO doing business as HARRAH'S CHESTER CASINO & RACETRACK
Case Number: 2:2020cv03043
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 PLEADING #5 MAILED TO THE UNREPS (JL )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFF DANIEL LIZARDO, FOR RELIEF FOR REMAND TO PENNSYLVANIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 7/20/20. 7/21/20 ENTERED AND CHAMBERS WILL MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(JL )
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Praecipe to Withdraw Notice of Removal by CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT OPERATING COMPANY, INC. D/B/A HARRAH'S CASINO. (JACKSON, DAMIAN)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DANIELA LIZARDO.Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HELENIAK, RICHARD)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against RICHARD WILLIAMS by CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT OPERATING COMPANY, INC. D/B/A HARRAH'S CASINO. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(JACKSON, DAMIAN) Modified on 7/1/2020 (tjd).
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT OPERATING COMPANY, INC. D/B/A HARRAH'S CASINO with Certificate of Service, PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 200500747, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14374827), filed by CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT OPERATING COMPANY, INC. D/B/A HARRAH'S CASINO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(JACKSON, DAMIAN) Modified on 6/25/2020 (tjd). (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/25/2020) (tjd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIZARDO v. CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT OPERATING COMPANY, INC. D/B/A HARRAH'S CASINO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES, NOS. 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT OPERATING COMPANY, INC. D/B/A HARRAH'S CASINO
Represented By: DAMIAN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOE CORPORATIONS, NOS. 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESTER DOWNS AND MARINA, LLC D/B/A HARRAH'S PHILADELPHIA CASINO & RACETRACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRAH'S CASINO doing business as HARRAH'S CHESTER CASINO & RACETRACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELA LIZARDO
Represented By: RICHARD J. HELENIAK
Represented By: ALAINA A. GREGORIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?