SZCZYPORSKI et al
Trustee: SCOTT F. WATERMAN and UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Debtor In Possession: ROBERT SZCZYPORSKI and BONNIE SZCZYPORSKI
Appellee: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2020cv03133
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Briefing Schedule 7/23/2020 Entered and copies e-mailed. (ahf)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Original Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Appeal, Docket Sheets, Order, #2 Docket Sheets)(ahf)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 Praecipe to attach document by BONNIE SZCZYPORSKI, ROBERT SZCZYPORSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LITVAK, SERGEY) Modified on 7/8/2020 (tjd).
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SERGEY JOSEPH LITVAK on behalf of BONNIE SZCZYPORSKI, ROBERT SZCZYPORSKI (LITVAK, SERGEY)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE LAMAR BISHOP on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE with Certificate of Service(BISHOP, KYLE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of BONNIE SZCZYPORSKI, ROBERT SZCZYPORSKI from the order of Bankruptcy Judge JEAN K. FITZSIMON filed on 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 APPEAL)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SZCZYPORSKI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: SCOTT F. WATERMAN
Represented By: SCOTT F. WATERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: ROBERT SZCZYPORSKI
Represented By: SERGEY JOSEPH LITVAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: BONNIE SZCZYPORSKI
Represented By: SERGEY JOSEPH LITVAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: KYLE LAMAR BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?