CIGAR ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. et al v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: CIGAR ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., SWEDISH MATCH NORTH AMERICA, LLC, SWISHER INTERNATIONAL, INC. and ITG CIGARS, INC.
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA and THOMAS FARLEY
Case Number: 2:2020cv03220
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (md, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Opposition to PI with Certificate of Service by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, THOMAS FARLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N) (WALSH, DANIELLE)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO FILE AND SERVE A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION, IF ANY, TO THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AUGUST 31, 2020. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/13/2020. 8/13/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
July 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUCTION HEARING IS SET FOR 10/7/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 10B BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (sfl, )
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHALL TAKE PLACE ON 10/7/2020 AT 10:00 AM. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) 7/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. ERDLEN on behalf of CIGAR ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., ITG CIGARS, INC., SWEDISH MATCH NORTH AMERICA, LLC, SWISHER INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(ERDLEN, ANDREW)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. SUMMERS on behalf of CIGAR ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., ITG CIGARS, INC., SWEDISH MATCH NORTH AMERICA, LLC, SWISHER INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(SUMMERS, JOHN)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE E. WALSH on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, THOMAS FARLEY with Certificate of Service(WALSH, DANIELLE)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 7/10/2020 AT 1:00 PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA P. CORTES on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, THOMAS FARLEY with Certificate of Service(CORTES, DIANA)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THOMAS FARLEY, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14392190), filed by THOMAS FARLEY, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit PI Motion, #3 Exhibit Docket Sheeet, #4 Exhibit Notice to Prothonotary, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Designation Form, #7 Case Management Track Form)(FIELD, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CIGAR ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. et al v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIGAR ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: MARK A. ARONCHICK
Represented By: JOHN S. SUMMERS
Represented By: ANDREW M. ERDLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWEDISH MATCH NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: MARK A. ARONCHICK
Represented By: JOHN S. SUMMERS
Represented By: ANDREW M. ERDLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWISHER INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: MARK A. ARONCHICK
Represented By: JOHN S. SUMMERS
Represented By: ANDREW M. ERDLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ITG CIGARS, INC.
Represented By: MARK A. ARONCHICK
Represented By: JOHN S. SUMMERS
Represented By: ANDREW M. ERDLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: BENJAMIN H. FIELD
Represented By: DANIELLE E. WALSH
Represented By: DIANA P. CORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS FARLEY
Represented By: BENJAMIN H. FIELD
Represented By: DANIELLE E. WALSH
Represented By: DIANA P. CORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?