MAZZA et al v. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MARK MAZZA, LISA MAZZA and SOPHIA MAZZA
Defendant: JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, MERSCORP HOLDINGS INC., BAC HOME LOAN SERVICING LP, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC and THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION doing business as THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON
Case Number: 2:2020cv03253
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Letter dated 7/30/20 by MARK MAZZA (jaa, )
August 3, 2020 5 Summons Issued as to BAC HOME LOAN SERVICING LP, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., MERSCORP HOLDINGS INC., SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION. Forwarded To: MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS on 8/3/2020 (sg, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
July 2, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE216287 (dmc, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAC HOME LOAN SERVICING LP, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, MERSCORP HOLDINGS INC., SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION, Proof of Service, (Filing fee $400.), filed by PRO SE PLFFS LISA MAZZA, MARK MAZZA. (Attachments: #1 Cover sheets)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAZZA et al v. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MAZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA MAZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOPHIA MAZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP HOLDINGS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC HOME LOAN SERVICING LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION doing business as THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?