STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS ACADEMY INC. v. VARSITY BRANDS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS INC. D/B/A STARS AND STRIPES KIDS ACTIVITY CENTER and STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS ACADEMY INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED doing business as STARS AND STRIPES KIDS ACTIVITY CENTER
Defendant: VARSITY BRANDS, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC and U.S. ALL STAR FEDERATION, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03277
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSED CONSISTENT WITH THE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO CLOSE THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/12/20. 8/13/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS ACADEMY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Transfer CASES TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TENNESSEE filed by VARSITY BRANDS, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Declaration of John Newby, #5 Declaration of Steven Kaiser, #6 Declaration of Steve Peterson)(POZOS, ANTONIO)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTONIO MIGUEL POZOS on behalf of VARSITY BRANDS, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC with Certificate of Service(POZOS, ANTONIO)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS ACADEMY INC.. U.S. ALL STAR FEDERATION, INC. waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS ACADEMY INC.. VARSITY BRANDS, LLC waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA)
July 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to U.S. ALL STAR FEDERATION, INC., VARSITY BRANDS, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/6/2020 (bw, )
July 2, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS ACADEMY INC.. (fb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. ALL STAR FEDERATION, INC., VARSITY BRANDS, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14397752.), filed by STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS ACADEMY INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(LIEBENBERG, ROBERTA) Modified on 7/6/2020 (fb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS ACADEMY INC. v. VARSITY BRANDS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VARSITY BRANDS, LLC
Represented By: ANTONIO MIGUEL POZOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC
Represented By: ANTONIO MIGUEL POZOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC
Represented By: ANTONIO MIGUEL POZOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ALL STAR FEDERATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS INC. D/B/A STARS AND STRIPES KIDS ACTIVITY CENTER
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARS AND STRIPES GYMNASTICS ACADEMY INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED doing business as STARS AND STRIPES KIDS ACTIVITY CENTER
Represented By: ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?