Cruz v. WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: Antonye Cruz
Defendant: WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC., WALGREEN CO., WALGREEN NATIONAL CORP., GB BRIDGE, LLC, WALGREEN EASTERN COMPANY, INC., WALGREEN STORES, INC, WALGREEN COMPANY and WALGREENS STORE #5522
Case Number: 2:2020cv03338
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ems)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Pretrial Conference held on 9/2/20 (amas, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/9/2021, AT 9:30 AM, IN ROOM 3040, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 9/2/20. 9/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS; E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE SCHEDULED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY. ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED BY 9/16/20. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 1/8/21. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 1/22/21. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 2/26/21. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA NO LATER THAN 3/16/21. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/23/21, AT 9:00 AM, IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 5118). THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 4/8/21, AT 9:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 5D. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 9/2/20. 9/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS; E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 2, 2020 PLEADINGS #10 #11 MAILED TO UNREPS (JL )
August 27, 2020 DOC # 9 MAILED TO UNREPS ON 8/27/20 (rf, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON SEPTEMBER 2, 2020, AT 11:00 A.M. AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 8/12/20. 8/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 8/12/2020 (jaa, ).
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND (DOC. NO. #4 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 7/31/20. 7/31/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 7/31/20. 7/31/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Pretrial Conference held on 7/28/20 (amas, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by WALGREEN COMPANY, WALGREEN EASTERN COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SANZO, ROBERT)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Antonye Cruz.Motion with Incorporated Memorandum of Law.(WEST, KEITH)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 Entry of Appearance of Keith Thomas West by Antonye Cruz. (WEST, KEITH)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Walgreen Co. by WALGREEN CO., WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC..(SANZO, ROBERT)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC., WALGREEN CO. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14407228), filed by WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC., WALGREEN CO..(SANZO, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC.
Represented By: ROBERT L. SANZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN CO.
Represented By: ROBERT L. SANZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN NATIONAL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GB BRIDGE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN EASTERN COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT L. SANZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN STORES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT L. SANZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREENS STORE #5522
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonye Cruz
Represented By: DAVID P. THIRUSELVAM
Represented By: KEITH THOMAS WEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?