WILLIAMS v. ROC NATION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SAQUETA WILLIAMS
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC., ROC NATION, LLC, THE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CORPORATION, ROBERT RIHMEEK WILLIAMS, SHAWN COREY CARTER, JAY-Z and MEEK MILL
Case Number: 2:2020cv03387
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT ELLYDE R. THOMPSON'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR SHAWN COREY CARTER, ROC NATION, LLC, ROBERT RIHMEEK WILLIAMS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/4/2020.9/4/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT ALEX SPIRO'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR SHAWN COREY CARTER, ROC NATION, LLC, ROBERT RIHMEEK WILLIAMS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/4/2020.9/4/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT ALLISON L. MCGUIRE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR SHAWN COREY CARTER, ROC NATION, LLC, ROBERT RIHMEEK WILLIAMS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/4/2020.9/4/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14543175.) filed by SHAWN COREY CARTER, ROC NATION, LLC, ROBERT RIHMEEK WILLIAMS.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(SHAPIRO, ASHLEY)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14543174.) filed by SHAWN COREY CARTER, ROC NATION, LLC, ROBERT RIHMEEK WILLIAMS.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(SHAPIRO, ASHLEY)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14543173.) filed by SHAWN COREY CARTER, ROC NATION, LLC, ROBERT RIHMEEK WILLIAMS.Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(SHAPIRO, ASHLEY)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Nicholas Viveros, United Process Service, Inc. re: served Summons, Complaint, Designation Form, Track Designation Form upon Robert Rihmeek Williams by Hand Delivery - Process Server on 08/20/2020 (MARINO, STEVEN)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Nicholas Viveros, United Process Service, Inc. re: served Summons, Complaint, Designation Form, Track Designation Form upon Andrew Eigr, Legal Clerk (Shawn Corey Carter) by Hand Delivery - Process Server on 08/20/2020 (MARINO, STEVEN)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Nicholas Viveros, United Process Service, Inc. re: served Summons, Complaint, Designation Form, Track Designation Form upon Jacon Lewis (Roc Nation, LLC) by Hand Delivery - Process Server on 08/20/2020 (MARINO, STEVEN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAQUETA WILLIAMS. AMAZON.COM, INC. waiver sent on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (MARINO, STEVEN)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAQUETA WILLIAMS. THE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (MARINO, STEVEN) Modified on 8/3/2020 (fb).
July 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to AMAZON.COM, INC., SHAWN COREY CARTER, ROC NATION, LLC, THE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CORPORATION, ROBERT RIHMEEK WILLIAMS. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/13/2020 (bw, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14414080.), filed by SAQUETA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(MARINO, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. ROC NATION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROC NATION, LLC
Represented By: ELLYDE R. THOMPSON
Represented By: ASHLEY EVE SHAPIRO
Represented By: ALLISON L. MCGUIRE
Represented By: ALEXANDER SPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT RIHMEEK WILLIAMS
Represented By: ELLYDE R. THOMPSON
Represented By: ASHLEY EVE SHAPIRO
Represented By: ALLISON L. MCGUIRE
Represented By: ALEXANDER SPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN COREY CARTER
Represented By: ELLYDE R. THOMPSON
Represented By: ASHLEY EVE SHAPIRO
Represented By: ALLISON L. MCGUIRE
Represented By: ALEXANDER SPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY-Z
Represented By: ELLYDE R. THOMPSON
Represented By: ASHLEY EVE SHAPIRO
Represented By: ALLISON L. MCGUIRE
Represented By: ALEXANDER SPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEEK MILL
Represented By: ELLYDE R. THOMPSON
Represented By: ASHLEY EVE SHAPIRO
Represented By: ALLISON L. MCGUIRE
Represented By: ALEXANDER SPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAQUETA WILLIAMS
Represented By: STEVEN F. MARINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?