THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY v. OMEGA FLEX, INC.
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: OMEGA FLEX, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03429
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (afm, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: FILED IN ERROR, REFILED IN CORRECT CASE 20-3189.(sg, ) Modified on 8/6/2020 (sg, ). (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/6/2020) (sg, ).
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Pretrial Conference held on 8/5/2020. (sg, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/18/2021 09:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 8/5/2020. 8/5/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE SCHEDULED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/18/2021 09:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/15/2021. DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 4/2/2021. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 4/30/2021. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 4/2/2021. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 5/11/2021. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 5/11/2021. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 6/3/2021 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 8/5/2020. 8/5/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Omega Flex, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by OMEGA FLEX, INC..(CONROY, WILLIAM)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JARED L. ELSTER on behalf of THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(ELSTER, JARED)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/5/2020 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 7/17/2020. 7/17/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. CONROY on behalf of OMEGA FLEX, INC. with Certificate of Service(CONROY, WILLIAM)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by LYNNE O'BRIEN INGRAM on behalf of OMEGA FLEX, INC. with Certificate of Service(O'BRIEN INGRAM, LYNNE)
July 13, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by OMEGA FLEX, INC.. (lisad, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OMEGA FLEX, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14417899), filed by OMEGA FLEX, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit)(GREWE, ERIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY v. OMEGA FLEX, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMEGA FLEX, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. CONROY
Represented By: ERIN GREWE
Represented By: LYNNE O'BRIEN INGRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS PAOLINI
Represented By: JARED L. ELSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?